EP1436255 - NOVEL COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS AS CATHEPSIN INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharmaceuticals Inc. 300 Somerset Corporate Boulevard Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | For all designated states AXYS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 180 Kimbal Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states Aventis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 300 Somerset Corporate Boulevard Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | ||
For all designated states AXYS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 180 Kimbal Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | |||
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Aventis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 300 Somerset Corporate Boulevard Bridgwater, New Jersey 08807-2854 / US | ||
For all designated states AXYS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 180 Kimbal Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAUPE, Michael 1131 Banyan Way Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | 02 /
PALMER, James, T. 131 Koch Road Corte Madera, CA 94925 / US | 03 /
ALDOUS, David, J. 31 Dunbridge Lane Gillette, NJ 07933 / US | 04 /
THURAIRATNAM, Sukanthini 6 Smoke Rise Lane Bedminster, NJ 07921 / US | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Hans-Jürgen, et al Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Industriepark Höchst Gebaüde K 801 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | Fischer, Hans-Jürgen, et al Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH, Patent- und Lizenzabteilung, Industriepark Höchst, K 801 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 02798975.5 | 16.09.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002US29323 | Priority number, date | US20010322318P | 14.09.2001 Original published format: US 322318 P | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03024924 | Date: | 27.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1436255 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07C317/48, C07C317/50, C07D207/24, C07D223/08, C07D295/20, C07D307/32, C07K5/065, A61K31/10, A61P19/02, A61P29/00 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
C07D295/215 (EP,US);
C07C317/48 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07C317/50 (EP,US);
C07D205/085 (EP,US);
C07D207/24 (EP,US);
C07D207/48 (EP,US);
C07D223/12 (EP,US);
C07D307/32 (EP,US);
C07K5/0606 (EP,US);
C07K5/06078 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/29] | Extension states | AL | 14.04.2004 | LT | 14.04.2004 | LV | 14.04.2004 | MK | 14.04.2004 | RO | 14.04.2004 | SI | 14.04.2004 | Title | German: | NEUE VERBINDUNGEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ALS CATHEPSININHIBITOREN | [2004/29] | English: | NOVEL COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS AS CATHEPSIN INHIBITORS | [2004/29] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPOSES ET NOUVELLES COMPOSITIONS UTILES COMME INHIBITEURS DE LA CATHEPSINE | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 01.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/45] | 04.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9630353 (ARRIS PHARM CORP [US]) [A] 1-16 * page 3 - page 4; table 2 *; | [A]WO0059881 (NAEJA PHARMACEUTICAL INC [CA], et al) [A] 13-16* page 3 - page 4 *; | [A]WO0069855 (MEDIVIR UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 13-16 * page 2 - page 3 *; | [DA]WO0119796 (AXYS PHARM INC [US], et al) [DA] 1-16 * page 2 - page 4; example -; claims 1,11-13 * |