EP1456573 - DEVICE FOR SEALED COUPLING OF TWO RIGID TUBES OF SAME EXTERNAL DIAMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIMA 6, avenue Elie Sermet 11100 Narbonne / FR | [2004/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CALMETTES, Lionel 5, Ecoubillat F-23220 Bonnat / FR | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Laget, Jean-Loup Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | Laget, Jean-Loup Cabinet Loyer, 78, avenue Raymond Poincaré 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02799104.1 | 19.12.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002FR04450 | Priority number, date | FR20010016664 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: FR 0116664 | [2004/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03054431 | Date: | 03.07.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1456573 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1456573 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16L21/00, F16L21/06 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
F16L21/005 (EP);
F16L21/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTE KUPPLUNGSVORRICHTUNG FUER ZWEI STARRE ROHRE MIT GLEICHEN AUSSENDURCHMESSERN | [2004/38] | English: | DEVICE FOR SEALED COUPLING OF TWO RIGID TUBES OF SAME EXTERNAL DIAMETER | [2004/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF D ACCOUPLEMENT ETANCHE DE DEUX TUBES RIGIDES DE MEME DIAMETRE EXTERIEUR | [2005/15] |
Former [2004/38] | DISPOSITIF D ACCOUPLEMENT ETANCHE DE DEUX TUBES RIGIDES DE M EME DIAMETRE EXTERIEUR | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 25.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.08.2005 | CZ | 17.08.2005 | EE | 17.08.2005 | FI | 17.08.2005 | IE | 17.08.2005 | NL | 17.08.2005 | SI | 17.08.2005 | SK | 17.08.2005 | TR | 17.08.2005 | BG | 17.11.2005 | DK | 17.11.2005 | GR | 17.11.2005 | SE | 17.11.2005 | CY | 19.12.2005 | BE | 31.12.2005 | LU | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | PT | 17.01.2006 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/13] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
CZ | 17.08.2005 | ||
EE | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
IE | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
SI | 17.08.2005 | ||
SK | 17.08.2005 | ||
TR | 17.08.2005 | ||
BG | 17.11.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
BE | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
CZ | 17.08.2005 | ||
EE | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
IE | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
SI | 17.08.2005 | ||
SK | 17.08.2005 | ||
TR | 17.08.2005 | ||
BG | 17.11.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
CZ | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
IE | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
SI | 17.08.2005 | ||
SK | 17.08.2005 | ||
TR | 17.08.2005 | ||
BG | 17.11.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
CZ | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
IE | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
SI | 17.08.2005 | ||
SK | 17.08.2005 | ||
BG | 17.11.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/29] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
CZ | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
IE | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
SI | 17.08.2005 | ||
SK | 17.08.2005 | ||
BG | 17.11.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
CZ | 17.08.2005 | ||
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
IE | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
SI | 17.08.2005 | ||
BG | 17.11.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
IE | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
SI | 17.08.2005 | ||
BG | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
SI | 17.08.2005 | ||
BG | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 17.08.2005 | |
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
SI | 17.08.2005 | ||
BG | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB570913 (GEORGE TAYLOR) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claims 1-5 *; | [A]FR1537581 (BERRIAT) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US3724878 (FORD J) [A] 1* figures 1-6; claims 1-7 *; | [A]DE19901663 (RASMUSSEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US3479066 | DE3843738 | EP0458700 |