EP1466255 - SUPERCHARGE MESSAGE EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emulex Corporation 3535 Harbor Boulevard Costa Mesa, CA 92628 / US | [2004/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Michael c/o Emulex Design & Manufacturing Corp. 3333, Susan Street Costa Mesa, CA 92626 / US | 02 /
ROACH, Bradley c/o Emulex Design & Manufacturing Corp. 3333, Susan Street Costa Mesa, CA 92626 / US | 03 /
SU, Sam c/o Emulex Design & Manufacturing Corp. 3333, Susan Street Costa Mesa, CA 92626 / US | 04 /
FIACCO, Peter c/o Emulex Design & Manufacturing Corp. 3333, Susan Street Costa Mesa, CA 92626 / US | [2009/13] |
Former [2004/43] | 01 /
LIU, Michael, c/o Emulex Design&Manufacturing Corp 3333, Susan Street Costa Mesa, CA 92626 / US | ||
02 /
ROACH, Bradley, c/o Emulex Design&Manufacturing Co 3333, Susan Street Costa Mesa, CA 92626 / US | |||
03 /
SU, Sam, c/o Emulex Design & Manufacturing Corp. 3333, Susan Street Costa Mesa, CA 92626 / US | |||
04 /
FIACCO, Peter, c/o Emulex Design&Manufacturing Cor 3333, Susan Street Costa Mesa, CA 92626 / US | |||
Former [2004/42] | 01 /
LIU, Michael 2200 W. Larch Street F Alhambra, CA 91801 / US | ||
02 /
ROACH, Bradley 111 45th Street Newport Beach, CA 92663 / US | |||
03 /
SU, Sam 17 Fairdawn Irvine, CA 92614 / US | |||
04 /
FIACCO, Peter 3420 Fairmont Yorba Linda, CA 92686 / US | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2004/42] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 02799935.8 | 11.12.2002 | [2004/42] | WO2002US39788 | Priority number, date | US20010340386P | 12.12.2001 Original published format: US 340386 P | US20020316604 | 10.12.2002 Original published format: US 316604 | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03050692 | Date: | 19.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1466255 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1466255 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/28 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
G06F13/28 (EP,KR,US);
G06F13/14 (KR);
G06F13/387 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/42] | G06F13/28, G06F13/14 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2009/13] |
Former [2004/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SUPERCHARGE-NACHRICHTENAUSTAUSCHVORRICHTUNG | [2004/42] | English: | SUPERCHARGE MESSAGE EXCHANGER | [2004/42] | French: | ECHANGEUR DE MESSAGES A SURALIMENTATION | [2004/42] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2004 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 15.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2005 | 31.12.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.01.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 25.03.2009 | SE | 25.06.2009 | [2013/46] |
Former [2011/14] | IT | 25.03.2009 | |
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GB | 11.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/05] | SE | 25.06.2009 | |
GB | 11.12.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | SE | 25.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5561770 (DE BRUIJN RONNY P [NL], et al) [X] 1-64 * figure 1 * * figure 11 * * column 5, line 31 - column 6, line 16 * * column 8, line 36 - line 53 * * column 43, line 14 - column 44, line 23 *; | [A]WO0058843 (QLOGIC CORP [US]) [A] 1-64* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5828856 (BOWES MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [Y]US5875343 (BINFORD CHARLES D [US], et al); | [Y]US5961614 (CHRISTIANSEN KEVIN M [US]); | [Y]US6061748 (TAGLIONE JOHN V [CA], et al); | [Y]US6253250 (EVANS KEITH M [US], et al) |