EP1459112 - COLOR EFFECT COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG Industries Ohio, Inc. 3800 West 143rd Street Cleveland, OH 44111 / US | [2004/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUNRO, Calum H. 112 Candleridge Drive Wexford, PA 15090 / US | 02 /
MERRITT, Mark D. 507 Luke Court Cranberry Township, PA 16066 / US | 03 /
LAMERS, Paul H. Siemensweg 8 71711 Steinheim / DE | [2004/44] |
Former [2004/39] | 01 /
MUNRO, Calum H. 112 Candleridge Drive Wexford, PA 15090 / US | ||
02 /
MERRITT, Mark D. 2810 Shetland Place, Apartment 227 Allison Park, PA 15101 / US | |||
03 /
LAMERS, Paul H. Siemensweg 8 71711 Steinheim / DE | Representative(s) | Fleischer, Holm Herbert polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | Fleischer, Holm Herbert, Dr. Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 02799978.8 | 20.12.2002 | [2004/39] | WO2002US41290 | Priority number, date | US20010034825 | 27.12.2001 Original published format: US 34825 | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03058299 | Date: | 17.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1459112 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1459112 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/20, C09D5/36 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
G02B5/223 (EP,US);
C09D5/004 (EP,US);
C09D5/36 (EP,US);
G02B5/206 (EP,US);
G02B5/287 (EP,US);
B65D2203/12 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24372 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2438 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2009/44] |
Former [2004/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FARBEFFEKT ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2004/39] | English: | COLOR EFFECT COMPOSITIONS | [2004/39] | French: | COMPOSITIONS A EFFET COLORE | [2004/39] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 01.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]US5944994 (ASHER SANFORD A [US], et al) [DX] 1-74 * figures 2,3A,6-10; examples 2-4; claims 1-5 *; | [A]US5824733 (DOEBERT JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-74 * claims 1-12 *; | [A]US5527386 (STATZ HERMANN [US]) [A] 1-74 * column 15, line 26 - column 18, line 46; claims 1,18 *; | [A]US5624731 (DESJARDINS ALEXANDER [US]) [A] 1-74 * column 3, line 35 - line 45; figure 1 * |