EP1430006 - ACCELERATOR COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Construction Research & Technology GmbH Dr.-Albert-Frank-Str. 32 83308 Trostberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states Construction Research & Technology GmbH Dr.-Albert-Frank-Strasse 32 83308 Trostberg / DE | ||
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Construction Research & Technology GmbH Dr.Albert-Frank-Strasse 32 83308 Trostberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANGELSKAAR, Terje Honeretshof 6 Berg Dietikon CH-8962 Zürich / CH | [2004/26] | Application number, filing date | 02800065.1 | 26.08.2002 | [2004/26] | WO2002EP09528 | Priority number, date | GB20010023364 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: GB 0123364 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03029163 | Date: | 10.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1430006 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1430006 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C04B40/00, C04B28/02, C04B22/06, C04B22/14, C04B22/16, C04B24/04, C04B103/10 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
C04B40/0039 (EP,US);
C04B2103/10 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00155 (EP,US);
C04B2111/1025 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B40/0039, C04B14/303, C04B22/148, C04B22/165, C04B24/04, C04B24/122, C04B28/02, C04B2103/50 (US,EP);
C04B40/0039, C04B22/06, C04B22/148, C04B22/165, C04B24/04, C04B24/122, C04B28/02, C04B2103/50 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHLEUNIGERZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2004/26] | English: | ACCELERATOR COMPOSITION | [2004/26] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ACCELERATEUR | [2004/26] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 29.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.08.2006 | CZ | 02.08.2006 | EE | 02.08.2006 | SK | 02.08.2006 | TR | 02.08.2006 | LU | 26.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | BG | 02.11.2006 | DK | 02.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
EE | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
TR | 02.08.2006 | ||
LU | 26.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
EE | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | MC | 31.08.2006 | |
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | BG | 02.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9818740 (GIULINI CHEMIE [DE], et al) [A] * page 3, lines 1-29 *; | [Y]WO0078688 (MBT HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-7,9 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 25 *; | [YD]WO0142165 (MBT HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [YD] 1-7,9 * the whole document * |