EP1434476 - AGRICULTURAL MACHINE, PARTICULARLY OF THE ROTARY MOWER TYPE, COMPRISING AN IMPROVED CUTTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/28] | AGRICULTURAL MACHINE, PARTICULARLY OF THE ROTARY MOWER TYPE, COMPRISING AN IMPROVED CHOPPING DEVICE | ||
[2008/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUHN S.A. 4, Impasse des Fabriques 67706 Saverne Cedex / FR | [2004/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUERBURG, Horst 6, rue des Aubépines F-67700 Saverne / FR | [2007/36] |
Former [2004/28] | 01 /
NEUERBURG, Horst 6, rue des Aubepines F-67700 Saverne / FR | Application number, filing date | 02800165.9 | 01.10.2002 | [2004/28] | WO2002FR03334 | Priority number, date | FR20010012699 | 03.10.2001 Original published format: FR 0112699 | [2004/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03028436 | Date: | 10.04.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1434476 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1434476 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/66 | [2004/28] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/28] | Title | German: | LANDMASCHINE, INSBESONDERE KREISELMÄHER, MIT VERBESSERTER SCHNEIDVORRICHTUNG | [2008/07] | English: | AGRICULTURAL MACHINE, PARTICULARLY OF THE ROTARY MOWER TYPE, COMPRISING AN IMPROVED CUTTING DEVICE | [2008/07] | French: | MACHINE AGRICOLE, NOTAMMENT DU TYPE FAUCHEUSE ROTATIVE, COMPORTANT UN DISPOSITIF DE COUPE AMELIOREE | [2004/28] |
Former [2004/28] | LANDMASCHINE, INSBESONDERE KREISELMÄHER, MIT VERBESSERTER HÄCKSELVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2004/28] | AGRICULTURAL MACHINE, PARTICULARLY OF THE ROTARY MOWER TYPE, COMPRISING AN IMPROVED CHOPPING DEVICE | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 18.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.02.2008 | EE | 13.02.2008 | BG | 13.05.2008 | SE | 13.05.2008 | GR | 14.05.2008 | PT | 14.07.2008 | LU | 01.10.2008 | BE | 31.10.2008 | CH | 31.10.2008 | LI | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/32] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
LU | 01.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/49] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/25] | EE | 13.02.2008 | |
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | EE | 13.02.2008 | |
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | EE | 13.02.2008 | |
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | SE | 13.05.2008 | |
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | SE | 13.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2524348 (NIEMEYER SOEHNE H) [A] 1,11-13 * page 6, paragraph L - page 9, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US4304088 (WERNER ANTON); | [A]FR2548862 (KUHN SA [FR]) [A] 2 * figure 2 *; | [X]US4686818 (ZWEEGERS PETRUS W [NL]) [X] 1,5 * column W *; | [A]US4693062 (VAN DER LELY IR E [NL], et al); | [X]DE19927966 (GREENLAND GELDROP BV [NL]) [X] 1,11-13 * figure .; claims 1,6 *; | [DA]EP1002458 (NIEMEYER LANDMASCH GMBH [DE]) |