EP1430971 - REINFORCEMENT BINDING MACHINE AND REEL USED FOR THE MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAX Kabushiki Kaisha 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | [2019/38] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Max Kabushiki Kaisha 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAGAWA, Yasushi, @MAX Kabushiki Kaisha 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | 02 /
ISHIKAWA, Noboru, @MAX Kabushiki Kaisha 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | 03 /
KUSAKARI, Ichiro, @MAX Kabushiki Kaisha 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | [2019/38] |
Former [2004/26] | 01 /
NAKAGAWA, Yasushi, MAX Kabushiki Kaisha 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | ||
02 /
ISHIKAWA, Noboru, MAX Kabushiki Kaisha 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | |||
03 /
KUSAKARI, Ichiro, MAX Kabushiki Kaisha 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | Feller, Frank Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2019/38] |
Former [2004/26] | Müller, Gerald Christian, et al Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02800287.1 | 30.09.2002 | [2004/26] | WO2002JP10187 | Priority number, date | JP20010304113 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001304113 | [2004/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03028916 | Date: | 10.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1430971 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1430971 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.04.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B21F15/06, E04G21/12, B65H49/20, B65H49/26, B65B13/28 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
E04G21/122 (EP,US);
B21F15/06 (KR);
B65H49/20 (EP,US);
E04G21/123 (EP,US);
B65B13/025 (EP,US);
B65H2701/5122 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/26] | B21F15/06, E04G21/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2019/38] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | MASCHINE ZUM VERRÖDELN VON BEWEHRUNGEN UND FÜR DIE MASCHINE VERWENDETE ROLLE | [2004/26] | English: | REINFORCEMENT BINDING MACHINE AND REEL USED FOR THE MACHINE | [2004/26] | French: | APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE CERCLER UN ÉLÉMENT DE RENFORT ET BOBINE UTILISÉE AVEC CET APPAREIL | [2019/02] |
Former [2004/26] | APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE CERCLER UN ELEMENT DE RENFORT ET BOBINE UTILISE AVEC CET APPAREIL | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2004 | Translation filed | 23.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18190244.6 / EP3427857 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 28.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.09.2019 | CY | 18.09.2019 | CZ | 18.09.2019 | DK | 18.09.2019 | EE | 18.09.2019 | ES | 18.09.2019 | FI | 18.09.2019 | IT | 18.09.2019 | MC | 18.09.2019 | NL | 18.09.2019 | SK | 18.09.2019 | TR | 18.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | IE | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | LU | 30.09.2019 | FR | 18.11.2019 | BG | 18.12.2019 | GR | 19.12.2019 | PT | 20.01.2020 | [2022/26] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
IE | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
LU | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 18.11.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
IE | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
LU | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 18.11.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
IE | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
LU | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
IE | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
LU | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
LU | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | EE | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 18.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH09240927 ; | [XY]US5692700 (BOBECZKO JAMES D [US]) [X] 2 * column 2, line 50 - line 53 * * figures 1-3,9 * [Y] 1,3,4 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09240927 A 19970916 (OOKI JUSHI KOGYO KK) [Y] 1,3,4 * abstract * * figure - * [A] 2 | International search | [A]JPH06190482 (TIMES ENG KK, et al); | [A]JPH06226386 (TIMES ENG KK, et al); | [A]JPH11156748 (MAX CO LTD); | [AP]JP2002225813 (SAN HOMU KK) | Examination | US4715555 | by applicant | JPH11104777 |