EP1438795 - METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING AND /OR RECEIVING DATA IN COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND APPARATUS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong, Youngdungpo-ku Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong, Youngdungpo-ku Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Young Jo Sanbon 6-danjee, 650-1904, Gwangjung-dong Kunpo-shi, 435-040 Kyonggi-do / KR | 02 /
YUN, Young Woo Doosan APT. 114-1502, Pongcheonbon-dong 1708 Kwanak-gu, 151-782 Seoul / KR | 03 /
AN, Jong Hoe Hogye 1-dong 987-5, Tongan-gu, Anyang-shi 431-081 Kyonggi-do / KR | 04 /
YOON, Suk Hyon MokdongShinsigagi APT. 931-1502, Shinjong1-dong Yangchon-gu, 158-071 Seoul / KR | 05 /
YOU, Cheol Woo Gunyoung APT. 102-1402, Pongchon-dong 1701 Kwanak-gu, 151-050 Seoul / KR | 06 /
KIM, Ki Jun Seocho Hanshin APT. 101-1202, Seocho-dong 1533 Seocho-gu, 137-070 Seoul / KR | 07 /
KIM, Young Cho Kyungnam Lakepark 1302, Songpa-dong 32-1 Songpa-gu, 138-170 Seoul / KR | [2012/06] |
Former [2004/30] | 01 /
LEE, Young Jo Sanbon 6-danjee, 650-1904, Gwangjung-dong Kunpo-shi, 435-040 Kyonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
YUN, Young Woo Doosan APT. 114-1502, Pongcheonbon-dong 1708 Kwanak-gu, 151-782 Seoul / KR | |||
03 /
AN, Jong Hoe Hogye 1-dong 987-5, Tongan-gu, Anyang-shi 431-081 Kyonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
YOON, Suk Hyon MokdongShinsigagi APT. 931-1502, Shinjong1-dong Yangchon-gu, 158-071 Seoul / KR | |||
05 /
YOU, Cheol Woo Gunyoung APT. 102-1402, Pongchon-dong 1701 Kwanak-gu, 151-050 Seoul / KR | |||
06 /
KIM, Ki Jun Seocho Hanshin APT. 101-1202, Seocho-dong 1533 Seocho-gu, 137-070 Seoul / KR | |||
07 /
KIM, Young Cho Kyungnam Lakepark 1302, Songpa-dong 32-1 Songpa-gu, 138-170 Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Palmer, Jonathan R., et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | Palmer, Jonathan Richard, et al Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens, 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 02800291.3 | 27.09.2002 | [2004/30] | WO2002KR01822 | Priority number, date | KR20010060962 | 29.09.2001 Original published format: KR 2001060962 | KR20010060963 | 29.09.2001 Original published format: KR 2001060963 | KR20010060964 | 29.09.2001 Original published format: KR 2001060964 | KR20010063248 | 13.10.2001 Original published format: KR 2001063248 | KR20010063261 | 13.10.2001 Original published format: KR 2001063261 | KR20010064014 | 17.10.2001 Original published format: KR 2001064014 | KR20010068403 | 03.11.2001 Original published format: KR 2001068403 | [2004/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03030407 | Date: | 10.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1438795 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1438795 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.04.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
H04L1/1896 (EP,US);
H04J13/0048 (EP,US);
H04J13/18 (EP,US);
H04W52/325 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04W72/569 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM TRANSFERIEREN UND/ODER EMPFANGEN VON DATEN IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2004/30] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING AND /OR RECEIVING DATA IN COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND APPARATUS THEREOF | [2004/30] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRANSFERT ET/OU RECEPTION DE DONNEES DANS UN SYSTEME DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS ET APPAREIL ASSOCIE | [2004/30] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 02.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07024103.9 / EP1895684 | EP09011779.7 / EP2124352 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2005 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   10.11.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.02.2012 | BE | 08.02.2012 | CY | 08.02.2012 | CZ | 08.02.2012 | DK | 08.02.2012 | EE | 08.02.2012 | FI | 08.02.2012 | IT | 08.02.2012 | NL | 08.02.2012 | SE | 08.02.2012 | SK | 08.02.2012 | TR | 08.02.2012 | BG | 08.05.2012 | GR | 09.05.2012 | ES | 19.05.2012 | PT | 08.06.2012 | IE | 27.09.2012 | LU | 27.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
TR | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 27.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 27.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | NL | 08.02.2012 | |
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | NL | 08.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [AP] - TSAI S. ET AL, "Allocation of walsh codes and quasi-orthogonal functions in cdma2000 forward link", IEEE VTC2001 FALL (ERICSSON), (20011007), vol. 2, pages 747 - 751, XP001124245 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VTC.2001.956870 | [AP] - QINGHUA S., LATVA-AHO M., "Simple spreading code allocation scheme for downlink MC-CDMA", IEEE ELECTRONIC LETTERS (OULU UNIV. FINLAND), (20020718), vol. 38, no. 15, pages 807 - 809, XP006018558 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:20020552 | Examination | - ERICSSON, "A new code multiplexing scheme for 1xEV-DV", VANCOUVER B/C, CANADA, (20010601), XP055001043 | - NOKIA, "Tdoc R2-011177", TSG-RAN WG2 MEETING #21, XX, XX, (20010521), XP002291723 | - KWON S ET AL, "TDM/CDM FOR 1XEV-DV FORWARD LINK", INTERNET CITATION, (20011105), URL: ftp://ftp.3gpp2.org/TSGC/Working/2001/TSG-C_0111/TSG-C-0111-Kauai/WG5 /C50-20011105-011-LGE-CDMr1.pdf, (20060511), XP007900608 |