EP1429875 - DENSE-PHASE FLUID CLEANING SYSTEM UTILIZING ULTRASONIC TRANSDUCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAYTHEON COMPANY EO/E1/E150 2000 East El Segundo Blvd P O Box 902 El Segundo, CA 90245-0902 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Raytheon Company EO/E1/E150, 2000 East El Segundo Blvd, P O Box 902 El Segundo, CA 90245-0902 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SORBO, Nelson, W. 16620 Cerise Ave Torrance, CA 90504 / US | 02 /
TOWNSEND, Carl, W. 3621 Redwood Ave Los Angeles, CA 90066 / US | 03 /
HENDERSON, Gilbert, E. 656 South San Antonio Drive Covina, CA 91723 / US | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02800381.2 | 27.09.2002 | [2004/26] | WO2002US30863 | Priority number, date | US20010325620P | 28.09.2001 Original published format: US 325620 P | US20020025505 | 26.09.2002 Original published format: US 25505 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03028909 | Date: | 10.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1429875 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B08B3/12, B08B7/00 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
A61L2/183 (EP);
A61L2/025 (EP);
B08B3/12 (EP);
B08B7/0021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALL-REINIGUNGSSYSTEM UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES FLUIDES IN SEINER DICHTEN PHASE | [2004/26] | English: | DENSE-PHASE FLUID CLEANING SYSTEM UTILIZING ULTRASONIC TRANSDUCERS | [2004/26] | French: | SYSTEME DE NETTOYAGE PAR FLUIDE A PHASE DENSE METTANT EN OEUVRE DES TRANSDUCTEURS ULTRASONIQUES | [2004/26] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 11.10.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US5377709 (SHIBANO) [X] 1-3,6 * column A * * column 2, line 26 - line 68 * * column 4, line 23 - column 6, line 14 * * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 12; figure - * [A] 8,10,11 [Y] 4,5,7; | [YA]EP0641611 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT COMPANY) [Y] 4,7-12 * column A * * column 4, line 37 - line 55 * * column 5, line 21 - line 30 * * column 6, line 29 - line 57; figure - * [A] 1,3,6; | [YA]US5909741 (FERRELL) [Y] 5,8-12 * column A * * column 4, line 34 - line 62; figure - * [A] 1,3,4,6; | [XA]EP0599585 (SHIBANO) [X] 1,2,6 * abstract * * column 4, line 28 - line 46 * * column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 25 * * column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 15 * * column 10, line 26 - column 11, line 2 * * column 11, line 21 - line 33 * * column 12, line 21 - line 30; figure - * [A] 8,10,11 |