EP1434556 - COSMETIC AND/OR PHARMACEUTICAL PREPARATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2004/28] | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEIPEL, Werner Hofstr. 29 40723 Hilden / DE | 02 /
ZANDER, Lars Cäcilienstrasse 12 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
ALBERS, Thomas Johannes-Hesse-Str. 31 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | [2004/28] | Application number, filing date | 02801312.6 | 04.10.2002 | [2004/28] | WO2002EP11118 | Priority number, date | DE2001150728 | 13.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10150728 | [2004/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03032931 | Date: | 24.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1434556 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/06, A61K7/48, A61K7/50, A61P17/16 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
A61K8/604 (EP,US);
A61K8/342 (EP,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,US);
A61K8/375 (EP,US);
A61K8/416 (EP,US);
A61K8/445 (EP,US);
A61K8/645 (EP,US);
A61K8/737 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE UND/ODER PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUBEREITUNGEN | [2004/28] | English: | COSMETIC AND/OR PHARMACEUTICAL PREPARATIONS | [2004/28] | French: | PREPARATIONS COSMETIQUES ET / OU PHARMACEUTIQUES | [2004/28] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 11.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/13] | 28.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4140474 (SCHUELKE & MAYR GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10 * page 2, line 6 - line 11 * * page 2, line 16 - line 39 * * page 2, line 66 - page 3, line 1 * * page 5, line 33 - line 55; examples 1-6; claims 1-14 *; | [X]EP0130609 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7 * page 2, paragraph 1; examples 1-4; claims 1-6 *; | [PX]EP1226814 (KAO CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-7 * page 2, line 23 - line 31; examples 1-5 *; | [X]DE4339368 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * examples 2-5; table 1 *; | [X]US4487760 (YAMAMOTO HIROMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * examples 1-5 *; | [X]EP1013754 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * example 3; table 1 *; | [X]JPS57119998 | [X] - "Shampoo composition with conditioning effect-contains alpha mono-(methyl branched alkyl) glyceryl ether", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1982-73568E, XP002230137 & JPS57119998 A 19820726 (KAO SOAP CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract * |