EP1440405 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REINSURANCE PLACEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Swiss Reinsurance Company Mythenquai 50/60 8022 Zurich / CH | [2004/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINMANN, Sylvia Untere Bruech 110 CH-8706 Meilen / CH | [2004/31] | Representative(s) | Vogel, Dany, et al Rentsch & Partner AG ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | Vogel, Dany, et al Rentsch & Partner AG Fraumünsterstrasse 9 Postfach 2441 8022 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2004/31] | Vogel, Dany, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 02801449.6 | 10.10.2002 | [2004/31] | WO2002IB04175 | Priority number, date | US20010328441P | 12.10.2001 Original published format: US 328441 P | [2004/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03034299 | Date: | 24.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1440405 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
G06Q40/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERSICHERUNGSPLAZIERUNG | [2004/31] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REINSURANCE PLACEMENT | [2004/31] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE PLACEMENT DE REASSURANCE | [2004/31] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 08.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/15] | 25.10.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.01.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/15] | Appeal following examination | 30.11.2005 | Appeal received No. T0204/06 | 30.01.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.01.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 21.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.01.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   10.01.2008 | 31.10.2008 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | Examination | WO0054203 | US5758126 | US5966716 | EP0918424 | US5657460 | US5978820 | US6084585 | US5983268 | US5832465 | US5704029 |