EP1447660 - SPECIFIC COMPONENT CONCENTRATION MEASURING METHOD AND CONCENTRATION MEASURING INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKRAY, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states Arkray, Inc. 57 Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | ||
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Arkray, Inc. 57 Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORITA, Yoshimitsu c/o Arkray, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho, Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | 02 /
OURA, Yoshimi c/o Arkray, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho, Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | [2004/34] | Representative(s) | Pluckrose, Anthony William, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | Pluckrose, Anthony William, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 02802056.8 | 22.10.2002 | [2004/34] | WO2002JP10967 | Priority number, date | JP20010328790 | 26.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001328790 | [2004/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03036285 | Date: | 01.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1447660 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1447660 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/416 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
G01N27/3274 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/34] | G01N27/327 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONZENTRATIONSMESSVERFAHREN UND KONZENTRATIONSMESSINSTRUMENT FÜR SPEZIFISCHE KOMPONENTEN | [2004/34] | English: | SPECIFIC COMPONENT CONCENTRATION MEASURING METHOD AND CONCENTRATION MEASURING INSTRUMENT | [2004/34] | French: | PROCEDE DE MESURE DE CONCENTRATION DE COMPOSANT SPECIFIQUE ET INSTRUMENT DE MESURE DE CONCENTRATION | [2004/34] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2004 | Translation filed | 04.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 10.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.03.2007 | BE | 21.03.2007 | CH | 21.03.2007 | CY | 21.03.2007 | CZ | 21.03.2007 | DK | 21.03.2007 | EE | 21.03.2007 | FI | 21.03.2007 | LI | 21.03.2007 | NL | 21.03.2007 | SK | 21.03.2007 | TR | 21.03.2007 | BG | 21.06.2007 | SE | 21.06.2007 | GR | 22.06.2007 | ES | 02.07.2007 | PT | 21.08.2007 | IE | 22.10.2007 | LU | 22.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
CY | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
EE | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
BG | 21.06.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.10.2007 | ||
LU | 22.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
CY | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
EE | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
EE | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CH | 21.03.2007 | |
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4396464 (GINER JOSE D, et al) [X] 1,7-9 * column 1, lines 9-42 * * column 2, line 52 - column 4, line 49; figures 4a-4d * [A] 2-6,10,11; | [A]EP0741186 (BAYER AG [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 1, lines 5-50 * * page 4, line 3 - page 6, line 33 ** page 8, lines 8-21; figures 1,3 *; | [A]EP1081490 (ARKRAY INC [JP]) [A] 1-11 * page 3, lines 25-32 * * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 3; figure 1 * | International search | [A]JPS5788365 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JPS62168045 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]JPS63259457 (NIKKISO CO LTD); | [A]JPH04357452 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al); | [A]JPH08304340 (BAYER AG); | [A]JPH09201337 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [A]JP2001091512 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |