EP1448403 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE SETTING OF AN ENGINE TORQUE AND A GEARBOX RATIO IN A VEHICLE WITH A CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE GEARBOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.2009 [2009/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/09] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUH, Joachim Eschenweg 2 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | 02 /
PAEULGEN, Markus Richard-Hirschmann-Strasse 9 73728 Esslingen a.N. / DE | 03 /
SEIDEL, Frank Grasgarten 20 70439 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
SENGER, Karl-Heinz Hills Tech Drive 38000 48331 Farmington Hills / US | 05 /
RIES-MUELLER, Klaus Heinsheimer Str. 47 74906 Bad Rappenau / DE | [2004/35] | Application number, filing date | 02802968.4 | 07.11.2002 | [2004/35] | WO2002DE04143 | Priority number, date | DE2001155372 | 10.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10155372 | [2004/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03041990 | Date: | 22.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1448403 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1448403 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60W10/10, B60W10/06 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W30/18 (EP,KR,US);
B60W10/04 (EP,US);
B60W10/101 (EP,US);
B60W10/107 (EP,KR,US);
B60W30/1819 (EP,US);
F16H61/66 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/35] | B60K41/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/09] |
Former [2004/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VORGABE EINES MOTORDREHMOMENTES UND EINER GETRIEBEÜBERSETZUNG BEI EINEM FAHRZEUG MIT KONTINUIERLICH VERSTELLBAREM GETRIEBE | [2004/35] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE SETTING OF AN ENGINE TORQUE AND A GEARBOX RATIO IN A VEHICLE WITH A CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE GEARBOX | [2004/35] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR DETERMINER UN COUPLE MOTEUR ET UN RAPPORT DE TRANSMISSION DANS UN VEHICULE A BOITE DE VITESSES REGLABLE EN CONTINU | [2004/35] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 10.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US6027425 (SAKAGUCHI SHINICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,25,27,28 * column 9, line 8 - line 17 * * column 10, line 17 - line 30; figures 1-4 * [A] 8,32; | [X]US6157885 (SAKAGUCHI SHINICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,25,27,28 * column 9, line 6 - line 30; figures 1,2,7,8 *; | [A]WO0038943 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-11,25-36 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9300531 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 12-14,36-38 * claims 14,15 *; | [A]DE19814483 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 15,39 * column A; figure - *; | [A]DE10010764 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 15,39 * abstract *; | [A]WO9725555 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [A]WO9934136 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) |