EP1446560 - SENSOR ARRANGEMENT FOR RECORDING THE MOVEMENT OF AN ARMATURE WITH SUPPRESSION OF INTERFERING VOLTAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FEV Motorentechnik GmbH Neuenhofstrasse 181 52078 Aachen / DE | [2004/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOIE, Christian Goethestrasse 25 52064 Aachen / DE | 02 /
KATHER, Lutz Heidestrasse 89 52146 Würselen / DE | 03 /
KEMPER, Hans Grossheidstrasse 106 52080 Aachen / DE | 04 /
ASMUS, Günther Frankenstrasse 56 52455 Titz-Höllen / DE | [2004/34] | Representative(s) | Schulz, Björn Maxton Langmaack & Partner Postfach 51 08 06 50944 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | Schulz, Björn Maxton Langmaack & Partner Postfach 51 08 06 50944 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 02803393.4 | 20.11.2002 | [2004/34] | WO2002EP13003 | Priority number, date | DE2001157120 | 21.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10157120 | [2004/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03044334 | Date: | 30.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1446560 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1446560 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01L9/04, G01D5/20, F02M65/00 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
F02M65/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSORANORDNUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG DER BEWEGUNG EINES ANKERS MIT UNTERDRÜCKUNG VON STÖRSPANNUNGEN | [2004/34] | English: | SENSOR ARRANGEMENT FOR RECORDING THE MOVEMENT OF AN ARMATURE WITH SUPPRESSION OF INTERFERING VOLTAGES | [2004/34] | French: | ENSEMBLE CAPTEUR CONCU POUR DETECTER LE MOUVEMENT D'UN INDUIT TOUT EN ELIMINANT LES TENSIONS PARASITES | [2004/34] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 21.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.07.2005 | EE | 06.07.2005 | ES | 06.07.2005 | FI | 06.07.2005 | FR | 06.07.2005 | GB | 06.07.2005 | IE | 06.07.2005 | IT | 06.07.2005 | NL | 06.07.2005 | SK | 06.07.2005 | TR | 06.07.2005 | BG | 06.10.2005 | DK | 06.10.2005 | GR | 06.10.2005 | SE | 06.10.2005 | AT | 20.11.2005 | CY | 20.11.2005 | BE | 30.11.2005 | LU | 30.11.2005 | MC | 30.11.2005 | PT | 12.12.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/40] | CZ | 06.07.2005 | |
EE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 06.07.2005 | ||
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
GB | 06.07.2005 | ||
IE | 06.07.2005 | ||
IT | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
SK | 06.07.2005 | ||
TR | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
AT | 20.11.2005 | ||
CY | 20.11.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
FR | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 06.07.2005 | |
EE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 06.07.2005 | ||
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
GB | 06.07.2005 | ||
IE | 06.07.2005 | ||
IT | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
SK | 06.07.2005 | ||
TR | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
AT | 20.11.2005 | ||
CY | 20.11.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/23] | CZ | 06.07.2005 | |
EE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 06.07.2005 | ||
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
GB | 06.07.2005 | ||
IE | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
SK | 06.07.2005 | ||
TR | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
AT | 20.11.2005 | ||
CY | 20.11.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | CZ | 06.07.2005 | |
EE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 06.07.2005 | ||
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
GB | 06.07.2005 | ||
IE | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
SK | 06.07.2005 | ||
TR | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
CY | 20.11.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/13] | CZ | 06.07.2005 | |
EE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 06.07.2005 | ||
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
GB | 06.07.2005 | ||
IE | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
SK | 06.07.2005 | ||
TR | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CZ | 06.07.2005 | |
EE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 06.07.2005 | ||
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
GB | 06.07.2005 | ||
IE | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
SK | 06.07.2005 | ||
TR | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | CZ | 06.07.2005 | |
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
GB | 06.07.2005 | ||
IE | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
SK | 06.07.2005 | ||
TR | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | CZ | 06.07.2005 | |
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
GB | 06.07.2005 | ||
IE | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
SK | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | CZ | 06.07.2005 | |
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
IE | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
SK | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/29] | CZ | 06.07.2005 | |
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
IE | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
SK | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | CZ | 06.07.2005 | |
FI | 06.07.2005 | ||
IE | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
DK | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 06.07.2005 | |
IE | 06.07.2005 | ||
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | FI | 06.07.2005 | |
NL | 06.07.2005 | ||
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 06.07.2005 | |
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
GR | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | ||
PT | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 06.07.2005 | |
BG | 06.10.2005 | ||
SE | 06.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB754917 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]EP0170723 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * page 14, line 8 - page 14, line 27; figures 5-8 *; | [A]US4866378 (REDLICH ROBERT W [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 35 - column 1, line 40; figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]DE19739840 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1* column 4, line 30 - column 4, line 45; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0916815 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * column 4, line 18 - column 4, line 21 * * column 4, line 45 - column 4, line 49 *; | [A]DE19918993 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 12 - column 6, line 55 * * column 7, line 50 - column 7, line 60; figures 1,4 *; | [A]EP1136662 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,7 * figure 1; claim 1 * |