EP1444852 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING CELL CONTOURING IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/33] | PASSIVE SHAPABLE SECTORIZATION ANTENNA GAIN DETERMINATION | ||
[2015/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metave Asset Holdings, LLC 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Wilmington DE 19808 / US | [2009/15] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states Kathrein Werke KG Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3 83022 Rosenheim / DE | ||
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states Metawave Communications Corporation 10735 Willows Road, N.E. Redmond, WA 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHERZER, Shimon, B. 10735 Willows Road Northeast Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 02 /
FRIEDLANDER, Benjamin 703 Coastland Drive Palo Alto, Ca 94303 / US | 03 /
RAMAKRISHNA, Deepa 2250 Monroe Street, 217 Santa Monica, CA 95050 / US | [2004/33] | Representative(s) | Small, Gary James, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2016/21] |
Former [2010/22] | Small, Gary James, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2009/15] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae Flach Haug Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | ||
Former [2004/33] | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, Dipl.-Phys., et al Andrae Flach Haug Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 02803632.5 | 14.11.2002 | [2004/33] | WO2002US36697 | Priority number, date | US20010999261 | 15.11.2001 Original published format: US 999261 | [2004/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03045094 | Date: | 30.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1444852 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1444852 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/18, // H04W16/24 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
H04W16/18 (EP);
H04W16/24 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/33] | H04Q7/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2016/21] |
Former [2004/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON ZELLEKONTURIERUNG IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | [2016/01] | English: | METHOD FOR PROVIDING CELL CONTOURING IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2016/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DÉFINIR LE CONTOUR DE CELLULE DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION CELLULAIRE | [2016/01] |
Former [2004/33] | VERSTÄRKUNGSBESTIMMUNG FÜR PASSIVE FORMBARE SEKTORISIERUNGSANTENNEN | ||
Former [2004/33] | PASSIVE SHAPABLE SECTORIZATION ANTENNA GAIN DETERMINATION | ||
Former [2004/33] | DETERMINATION DE GAIN D'ANTENNE A SECTORISATION MODELABLE PASSIVE | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 19.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.05.2016 | BE | 25.05.2016 | BG | 25.05.2016 | CY | 25.05.2016 | CZ | 25.05.2016 | DK | 25.05.2016 | EE | 25.05.2016 | ES | 25.05.2016 | FI | 25.05.2016 | IT | 25.05.2016 | MC | 25.05.2016 | NL | 25.05.2016 | SE | 25.05.2016 | SK | 25.05.2016 | TR | 25.05.2016 | GR | 26.08.2016 | PT | 26.09.2016 | IE | 14.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
TR | 25.05.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
IE | 14.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
IE | 14.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
BE | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 25.05.2016 | |
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 25.05.2016 | |
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 25.05.2016 | |
NL | 25.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0639035 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [Y] 1-72 * abstract * * column 15, line 9 - line 54 *; | [Y]WO9818271 (WATKINS JOHNSON CO [US]) [Y] 1-72 * abstract * * page 2, line 18 - line 25 * * page 3, line 19 - line 23 * * page 17, line 2 - line 13 *; | [X]WO0065742 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-72 * abstract * * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 13 * * page 8, line 19 - line 24 *; | [A]EP1081972 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-72 * abstract ** column 13, line 48 - column 14, line 18 * | International search | [X]US6111857 (SOLIMAN SAMIR S [US], et al) | Examination | WO0131941 | by applicant | WO0065742 |