EP1461150 - BIMETALLIC CATALYSTS WITH HIGHER ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Univation Technologies, LLC 5555 San Felipe Suite 1950 Houston, TX 77056 / US | [2006/48] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520-2101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINK, Robert, I. 1416 Crescent Drive Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | 02 /
NOWLIN, Thomas, E. 7 Perrine Path West Windsor, NJ 08550 / US | 03 /
SCHURZKY, Kenneth, G. 688 North View Drive Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 04 /
SANTANA, Robert, L. 2100 W. Baker Road Apt. 1326 Baytown, TX 77521 / US | 05 /
SHIRODKAR, Pradeep, P. 3118 Willow Wood Trail Kingwood, TX 77345 / US | [2004/44] |
Former [2004/40] | 01 /
MINK, Robert, I. 1416 Crescent Drive Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | ||
02 /
NOWLIN, Thomas, E. 7 Perrine Path West Windsor, NJ 08550 / US | |||
03 /
SCHURZKY, Kenneth, G. 688 North View Drive Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | |||
04 /
SANTANA, Robert, L. 6126 Cajun Way Baytown, TX 77520 / US | |||
05 /
SHIRODKAR, Pradeep, P. 3118 Willow Wood Trail Kingwood, TX 77345 / US | Representative(s) | Samuels, Lucy Alice, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Samuels, Lucy Alice, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2005/24] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane, et al Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2004/40] | Veldhuizen, Albert Dirk Willem, et al Exxon Chemical Europe Inc., P.O.Box 105 1830 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 02804395.8 | 03.10.2002 | [2004/40] | WO2002US31491 | Priority number, date | US20010334576P | 30.11.2001 Original published format: US 334576 P | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03047751 | Date: | 12.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1461150 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/64, C08F10/00, B01J31/22 | [2009/05] | CPC: |
C08F10/02 (EP,US);
C08F4/60 (KR);
B01J37/00 (KR);
C08F4/02 (KR);
C08F4/65904 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
C08F4/65925 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/02, C08F4/025 (US,EP);
C08F10/02, C08F4/6546 (EP,US);
C08F10/02, C08F4/65916 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/40] | B01J31/00, B01J37/00, C08F4/02, C08F4/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIMETALLKATALYSATOREN MIT HÖHERER AKTIVITÄT | [2004/40] | English: | BIMETALLIC CATALYSTS WITH HIGHER ACTIVITY | [2004/40] | French: | CATALYSEURS BIMETALLIQUES PRESENTANT UNE ACTIVITE SUPERIEURE | [2004/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 23.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/44] | 10.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY]EP0676418 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [DX] 16,17 * examples 4-6,8-10 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]WO9717136 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15* examples 1,2 *; | [E]WO02090393 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [E] 1-7,10-14,16,17 * catalyst preparation example 1 * * Polymerisation Example 1 * | International search | [XP]US6395669 (SARTAIN WILLIAM J [US], et al) |