EP1463586 - SELECTIVE FLOTATION AGENT AND FLOTATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rajic, Vladimir Cara Lazara 101 21234 Backi Jarak / RS | For all designated states Petkovic, Zoran U Tanta 5 37000 Krusevac / YU | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states Rajic, Vladimir Cara Lazara 101 21234 Backi Jarak / YU | ||
For all designated states Petkovic, Zoran U Tanta 5 37000 Krusevac / YU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 02804798.3 | 12.12.2002 | [2004/41] | WO2002YU00027 | Priority number, date | YU20010000879 | 12.12.2001 Original published format: YU 87901 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03049867 | Date: | 19.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1463586 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1463586 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B03D1/012, B03D1/01, B03D1/018, C22B19/02, C22B15/00 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
C22B15/0008 (EP,US);
B03D1/002 (EP,US);
B03D1/01 (EP,US);
B03D1/011 (EP,US);
B03D1/012 (EP,US);
B03D1/014 (EP,US);
B03D2201/02 (EP,US);
B03D2201/06 (EP,US);
B03D2203/02 (EP,US);
B03D2203/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | 26.06.2004 | RO | 26.06.2004 | Title | German: | SELEKTIVES FLOTATIONSMITTEL UND FLOTATIONSVERFAHREN | [2004/41] | English: | SELECTIVE FLOTATION AGENT AND FLOTATION METHOD | [2004/41] | French: | AGENT DE FLOTTAISON SELECTIF ET PROCEDE DE FLOTTAISON | [2004/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 09.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.01.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.2006 | BE | 22.03.2006 | CH | 22.03.2006 | CY | 22.03.2006 | CZ | 22.03.2006 | EE | 22.03.2006 | FR | 22.03.2006 | IT | 22.03.2006 | LI | 22.03.2006 | NL | 22.03.2006 | SI | 22.03.2006 | SK | 22.03.2006 | TR | 22.03.2006 | DK | 22.06.2006 | DE | 23.06.2006 | GB | 12.12.2006 | IE | 12.12.2006 | LU | 12.12.2006 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/01] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
CY | 22.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2006 | ||
EE | 22.03.2006 | ||
FR | 22.03.2006 | ||
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
DE | 23.06.2006 | ||
GB | 12.12.2006 | ||
IE | 12.12.2006 | ||
LU | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2006 | ||
EE | 22.03.2006 | ||
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
DE | 23.06.2006 | ||
GB | 12.12.2006 | ||
IE | 12.12.2006 | ||
LU | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2006 | ||
EE | 22.03.2006 | ||
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
DE | 23.06.2006 | ||
GB | 12.12.2006 | ||
IE | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2006 | ||
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
DE | 23.06.2006 | ||
GB | 12.12.2006 | ||
IE | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
DE | 23.06.2006 | ||
GB | 12.12.2006 | ||
IE | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
DE | 23.06.2006 | ||
IE | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
DE | 23.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
DE | 23.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 22.03.2006 | |
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | SI | 22.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4657669 (SHAW PETER [ZA], et al) [X] 1-12 * examples 1-3; claims 1-7 *; | [X]US4793852 (HARRIS GUY H [US], et al) [X] 1-7* column W *; | [X]US5074993 (KERR ANDREW N [CA], et al) [X] 1-7 * column W * |