EP1461957 - IMPROVING TEMPORAL CONSISTENCY IN VIDEO SHARPNESS ENHANCEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Yibin Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BOROCZKY, Lilla Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
JANSSEN, Johanes, G., W., M. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Steenbeek, Leonardus Johannes Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Steenbeek, Leonardus Johannes Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02805854.3 | 09.12.2002 | [2004/40] | WO2002IB05308 | Priority number, date | US20010029823 | 27.12.2001 Original published format: US 29823 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03056835 | Date: | 10.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1461957 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, H04N7/30 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
H04N19/527 (EP,US);
H04N19/85 (EP,KR,US);
H04N1/409 (KR);
H04N19/86 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERN DER ZEITLICHEN BESTÄNDIGKEIT BEI DER VIDEOSCHÄRFEVERBESSERUNG | [2004/40] | English: | IMPROVING TEMPORAL CONSISTENCY IN VIDEO SHARPNESS ENHANCEMENT | [2004/40] | French: | AMELIORATION DE LA COHERENCE TEMPORELLE DANS L'AMELIORATION DE LA NETTETE VIDEO | [2004/40] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 04.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/23] | 18.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO0042778 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [XA]WO0145389 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); |