EP1465547 - Methods of making flexible foams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/42] | BIORESORBABLE FOAM PACKING DEVICE AND USE THEREOF | ||
[2010/16] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENZYME CORPORATION One Kendall Square Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2004/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREENAWALT, Keith 52 Saint Mary's Road Milton, CA 02186 / US | 02 /
OLIVER, Dana 9152 Woodjack Ct. Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | [2004/47] |
Former [2004/42] | 01 /
GREENAWALT, Keith 52 Saint Mary's Road Milton, CA 02186 / US | ||
02 /
OLIVER, Dana 18 Filmore Street Plymouth, MA 02360 / US | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Epping Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02806231.3 | 27.12.2002 | [2004/42] | WO2002US41445 | Priority number, date | US20010343949P | 28.12.2001 Original published format: US 343949 P | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03057274 | Date: | 17.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1465547 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.05.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00, A61L31/04 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
A61L31/042 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/42] | A61F2/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Methoden zur Herstellung von anpassungsfähigen Schaumstoffen | [2010/16] | English: | Methods of making flexible foams | [2010/16] | French: | Méthodes pour la fabrication de mousses flexibles | [2010/18] |
Former [2004/42] | BIOLOGISCH ABSORBIERBARE SCHAUMSTOFFVERPACKUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2004/42] | BIORESORBABLE FOAM PACKING DEVICE AND USE THEREOF | ||
Former [2004/42] | DISPOSITIF DE BOURRAGE EN MOUSSE BIORESORBABLE ET SON UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 23.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 04.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.02.2005 | 31.12.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2006 | 31.12.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9220349 (GENZYME CORP [US]) [X] 11-16 * page 30, line 7 - line 22 * * page 30, line 24 - line 31 * * page 7, line 15 - line 18 *; | [XD]US5527893 (BURNS JAMES W [US], et al) [XD] 11-16 * column 3, line 40 - line 42 * * column 6, line 53 - line 57 *; | [A]WO0106973 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [XD]US6294202 (BURNS JAMES W [US], et al) [XD] 1-16 * column 9 - column 10; example 1 * * column 6, line 53 - line 57 * | International search | [Y]US5736586 (BASTIOLI CATIA [IT], et al); | [YT]US2002127265 (BOWMAN STEVEN M [US], et al) |