EP1471068 - PROCESS FOR TOTAL SYNTHESIS OF ECTEINASCIDINS AND INTERMEDIATES THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama 332-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUYAMA, Tohru 1-3-17-906, Etchujima Koto-ku, Tokyo 135-0044 / JP | 02 /
KAN, Toshiyuki 2-11-2-1002, Nedu Bunkyo-ku, Tokyo 113-0031 / JP | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | McCluskie, Gail Wilson, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | McCluskie, Gail Wilson, et al J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02806664.5 | 20.09.2002 | [2004/44] | WO2002JP09690 | Priority number, date | JP20020019360 | 29.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002019360 | [2004/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03064432 | Date: | 07.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1471068 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.08.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D515/22, C07D513/22, C07D491/22, C07D471/08, C07D317/64, C07C271/22, C07C269/06, C07D493/22 | [2005/14] | CPC: |
C07D471/08 (EP,US);
C07C271/22 (EP,US);
C07D317/64 (EP,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,US);
C07D413/04 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/44] | C07D515/22, C07D513/22, C07D491/22, C07D471/08, C07D317/64, C07C271/22, C07C269/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TOTALSYNTHESE VON ECTEINASCIDINEN UND ZWISCHENPRODUKTE DAFÜR | [2004/44] | English: | PROCESS FOR TOTAL SYNTHESIS OF ECTEINASCIDINS AND INTERMEDIATES THEREFOR | [2004/44] | French: | PROCEDE DE SYNTHESE TOTALE D'ECTEINASCIDINES ET INTERMEDIAIRES UTILISES DANS CE PROCEDE | [2004/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2004 | Translation filed | 23.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2004 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 11.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9812198 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [Y] 1-14 * page 52; example 33 *; | [XA]WO0153299 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US]) [X] 9 * figure 9B; page 15/22 * * the whole document *[A] 1-14; | [Y]WO0177115 (PHARMA MAR SA [ES], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 107 - page 110; examples 32-35 *; | [YP] - ENDO ATSUSHI ET AL, "Total synthesis of ecteinascidin 743", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20020517), vol. 124, no. 23, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 6552 - 6554, XP002961311 [YP] 1-14 * examples 15,21,26,29 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja026216d | [YP] - ZHOU ET AL, "Studies Directed to the Total Synthesis of ET 743 and Analogues Thereof: An Expeditious Route to the ABFGH Subunit", ORGANIC LETTERS, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (2002), vol. 4, no. 1, ISSN 1523-7060, pages 43 - 46, XP002224122 [YP] 1-14 * scheme 1, compounds 6, 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol016844k | [Y] - CUEVAS C ET AL, "SYNTHESIS OF ECTEINASCIDIN ET-743 AND PHTHALASCIDIN PT-650 FROM CYANOSAFRACIN B", ORGANIC LETTERS, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (2000), vol. 2, no. 16, ISSN 1523-7060, pages 2454 - 2458, XP002940454 [Y] 1-14 * scheme 1, compounds 12,13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol0062502 | [Y] - COREY E J ET AL, "ENANTIOSELECTIVE TOTAL SYNTHESIS OF ECTEINASCIDIN 743", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (1996), vol. 118, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 9202 - 9203, XP000941402 [Y] 1-14 * scheme 1, compounds 13, 14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja962480t | International search | [A]WO9812198 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]); | [A]WO0153299 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US]); | [A]WO0177115 (PHARMA MAR SA [ES], et al); | [A] - COREY E.J. ET AL., "Enantioselective total synthesis of ecteinascidin 743", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1996), vol. 118, no. 38, pages 9202 - 9203, XP000941402 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja962480t | [A] - HINTERDING KLAUS ET AL., "Synthesis and in vitro evaluation of the ras farnesyltransferase inhibitor pepticinnamin E", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (1998), vol. 37, no. 9, pages 1236 - 1239, XP002985182 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-3773(19980518)37:9<1236::AID-ANIE1236>3.0.CO;2-F | [XP] - ENDO ATSUSHI ET AL., "Total synthesis of ecteinascidin 743", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20020517), vol. 124, no. 23, pages 6552 - 6654, XP002961311 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja026216d |