EP1424123 - FILTER DEVICE COMPRISING SEMI-PERMEABLE MEMBRANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomassen, Johannes Adrianus Balmes, 76 1o-1a 08007 Barcelona / ES | [2004/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Isern-Jara, Nuria J. Isern Patentes y Marcas Avda. Diagonal 463 Bis 2[deg] 08036 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Isern Jara, Nuria Avda. Diagonal, 463 Bis 2 08036 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 02806710.6 | 09.08.2002 | [2004/23] | WO2002ES00398 | Priority number, date | ES20010001917 | 17.08.2001 Original published format: ES 200101917 | [2004/23] | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03078037 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1424123 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 25.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01D65/08, B01D63/16 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
B01D65/08 (EP,ES);
B01D63/16 (ES);
B01D2321/2083 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILTERVORRICHTUNG MIT HALBDURCHLÄSSIGEN MEMBRANEN | [2004/23] | English: | FILTER DEVICE COMPRISING SEMI-PERMEABLE MEMBRANES | [2004/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FILTRATION SUR MEMBRANES SEMI-PERMEABLES | [2004/23] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2004 | Translation filed | 16.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 17.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/52] | 01.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4872988 (CULKIN JOSEPH B [US]); | [A]WO9100135 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK [GB]); | [A]US5500134 (CHAHINE GEORGES L [US]); | [A]US5985160 (DILEO ANTHONY J [US], et al) |