EP1563230 - WATER HEATER WITH AN EXTERNAL ELECTRIC WINDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cadif Srl Via Monte Cervino, 2 37057 S. Giovanni Lupatoto / IT | [2005/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STABILE, Aldo Via C. Uberti, 2 I-26016 Crema / IT | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | Mocchetti, Ilio G. Via Aldrovandi, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [2005/33] | Application number, filing date | 02808118.0 | 09.12.2002 | [2005/33] | WO2002IT00769 | Priority number, date | IT2002MI02396 | 13.11.2002 Original published format: IT MI20022396 | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004044499 | Date: | 27.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1563230 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F24H1/18 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
F24H1/185 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERERWûRMER MIT EXTERNER ELEKTRISCHER WICKLUNG | [2005/33] | English: | WATER HEATER WITH AN EXTERNAL ELECTRIC WINDING | [2005/33] | French: | CHAUFFE-EAU A ENROULEMENT ELECTRIQUE EXTERNE | [2005/33] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 06.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/15] | 23.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2044611 (WALLIS HODGES LEE) [X] 1,2,5,9,12,13 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2679631 (THEVENON ANDRE) [A] 1,6,8,9 * page 10, line 34 - page 11, line 18; figure 2 *; | [A]US4833299 (ESTES EUGENE J) [A] 1,12,13 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0184491 (LACAZE PIERRE CHRISTIAN) [A] 1-3,11,13 * page 10, line 16 - page 10, line 29 * |