EP1575451 - ENDOLUMENAL PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Invatec S.p.A. Via Martiri della Libertà, 7 25030 Roncadelle (BS) / IT | [2010/15] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states Invatec S.r.l Via Martiri della Libertà, 7 25030 Roncadelle / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENTURELLI, Andrea Via L. Marenzio, 7 I-25062 Concesio BRESCIA / IT | [2010/13] |
Former [2005/38] | 01 /
VENTURELLI, Andrea Via L. Marenzio, 7 I-25062 Concesio / IT | Representative(s) | Crippa, Paolo Ernesto, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | Crippa, Paolo Ernesto, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02808280.8 | 19.12.2002 | [2005/38] | WO2002IT00813 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004056291 | Date: | 08.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1575451 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1575451 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/90 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
A61F2/856 (EP,US);
A61F2/91 (EP,US);
A61F2/915 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91508 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91516 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91525 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/38] | A61F2/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDOLUMINALE PROTHESE | [2005/38] | English: | ENDOLUMENAL PROSTHESIS | [2005/38] | French: | PROTHESE ENDOLUMINALE | [2005/38] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 24.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.11.2009 | 03.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.05.2010 | CZ | 05.05.2010 | EE | 05.05.2010 | SI | 05.05.2010 | SK | 05.05.2010 | TR | 05.05.2010 | BG | 05.08.2010 | LU | 19.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | BG | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
TR | 05.05.2010 | ||
LU | 19.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
LU | 19.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 05.05.2010 | |
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | CY | 05.05.2010 | |
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | CY | 05.05.2010 | |
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CY | 05.05.2010 | |
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | SI | 05.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9725937 (JANG G DAVID [US]) [A] 1-57* the whole document *; | [XY]US5935162 (DANG KENNY L [US]) [X] 1-15,19-29,31-34,40,41,43-46,50-53,57 * figures 1-3,6 * * column 3, line 6 - line 9 * * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 32 * [Y] 16-18,30,35-39,42,47-49,54-56; | [A]EP1095633 (BIOTRONIK MESS & THERAPIEG [DE]) [A] 1-57 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6299604 (RAGHEB ANTHONY O [US], et al) [Y] 55,56 * column 3, line 6 - line 18 *; | [Y]US2002065547 (MOORE BRIAN E [US]) [Y] 42 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2002183763 (CALLOL JOSEPH R [US], et al) [Y] 16-18,30,35-39,47-49,54 * figures 6A,7D7E,,8,9,21,35 * | by applicant | US5935162 |