EP1340448 - A screen filter for a liquid-conducting device, in particular a dishwashing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION 2000 M-63 Benton Harbor Michigan 49022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION 2000 M-63 Benton Harbor Michigan 49022 / US | ||
Former [2003/36] | For all designated states WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION 2000 M-63 Benton Harbor Michigan 49022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunkel, Jochen c/o Whirlpool Europe s.r.l. Patent Dept. V.le G. Borghi 27, 21025 Comerio / IT | 02 /
Heil, Michael c/o Whirlpool Europe s.r.l. Patent Dept. V.le G. Borghi 27, 21025 Comerio / IT | 03 /
Fierling, Yannich c/o Whirlpool Europe s.r.l. Patent Dept. V.le G. Borghi 27, 21025 Comerio / IT | [2019/21] |
Former [2003/36] | 01 /
Kunkel, Jochen c/o Whirlpool Europe s.r.l., Patent Dept. V.le G. Borghi 27, 21025 Comerio / IT | ||
02 /
Heil, Michael c/o Whirlpool Europe s.r.l., Patent Dept. V.le G. Borghi 27, 21025 Comerio / IT | |||
03 /
Fierling, Yannich c/o Whirlpool Europe s.r.l., Patent Dept. V.le G. Borghi 27, 21025 Comerio / IT | Representative(s) | Spina, Alessandro, et al Whirlpool Management EMEA S.R.L. Via Carlo Pisacane, 1 20016 Pero (MI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/21] | Spina, Alessandro, et al Whirlpool EMEA SpA Via Carlo Pisacane, 1 20016 Pero (MI) / IT | ||
Former [2003/36] | Guerci, Alessandro Whirlpool Europe S.r.l. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio (VA) / IT | Application number, filing date | 03000076.4 | 08.01.2003 | [2003/36] | Priority number, date | DE20021008992 | 28.02.2002 Original published format: DE 10208992 | [2003/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1340448 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1340448 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1340448 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1340448 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/42, D06F39/10 | [2003/36] | CPC: |
A47L15/4204 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2019/21] |
Former [2004/25] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE | ||
Former [2003/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flachfilter für ein wasserführendes Gerät, insbesondere eine Geschirrspülmaschine | [2003/36] | English: | A screen filter for a liquid-conducting device, in particular a dishwashing machine | [2003/36] | French: | Filtre plat pour un appareil conducteur d'eau, notamment un lave-vaisselle | [2003/36] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 16.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09154971.7 / EP2074921 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.03.2011
08.03.2011
ADMISSIBLE Electrolux Rothenburg GmbH Factory and Development Fürther Strasse 246 90429 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Schröer, Gernot H. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.03.2011
Electrolux Rothenburg GmbH Factory and Development Fürther Strasse 246 90429 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Schröer, Gernot H. Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Bankgasse 3 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE | 06.04.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.10.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.02.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.03.2014 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.03.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.09.2018 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 09.04.2019 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 14.04.2014 | Appeal received No. T0917/14 | 04.07.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.09.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 21.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.10.2018 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 09.01.2012 | SE | 09.01.2012 | [2014/26] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3591095 (STEFANO ALBERT DI) [A] * figures 3,7,8 *; | [A]DE2555153 (LICENTIA GMBH) [A] 1-4,9 * page 7, paragraphs 2,3; figures 2-4 *; | [Y]GB1530206 (EURO HAUSGERAETE GMBH) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 34 - line 39 * * page 2, line 9 - line 13; figure - *; | [A]DE2832084 (LICENTIA GMBH) [A] 1,4 * page 6, paragraph 2; figures 2-4 *; | [A]US4201345 (ZIEGLER WILLIAM D [US]) [A] 6 * figure 3 *; | [A]GB2033737 (VENTURINI P) [A] 1 * page 2, line 71 - line 111; figures 4-6 *; | [A]GB2038171 (HOBART CORP) [A] 2 * page 10, line 14 - line 20 *; | [A]DE29607001U (ADEK BAUTEILE GMBH [DE]) [A] * claim 1 *; | [Y]US5700329 (EDWARDS JAMES M [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 1 * * column 2, line 54 - line 58 * * column 3, line 7 - line 13; figures 3-6 *; | [A]FR2760624 (BAUDIN CHRISTOPHE [FR]) [A] 9 * page 1, line 29 - page 2, line 7 * | by applicant | GB1530206 | US5700329 | EP0988825 | Opposition | - PROF DR ING GOTTFRIED W EHRENSTEIN, "Mit Kunststoffen konstruieren Eine Einführung", XP002182430 |