EP1331090 - Process for the preparation of an elastic breathable composite sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nordenia Deutschland Gronau GmbH Jöbkesweg 11 48599 Gronau / DE | [2003/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamulski, Markus Wenningkamp 14 48599 Gronau-Epe / DE | 02 /
Schönbeck, Marcus Birkenweg 52 33775 Versmold / DE | 03 /
Baldauf, Georg Bammeltring 33 48366 Laer / DE | [2003/31] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Rainer Harald, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | Albrecht, Rainer Harald, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Theaterplatz 3 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03000241.4 | 08.01.2003 | [2003/31] | Priority number, date | DE2002102333 | 23.01.2002 Original published format: DE 10202333 | [2003/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1331090 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1331090 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/12, B32B5/26, B32B37/15 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
B32B37/144 (EP,US);
B32B27/10 (EP,US);
B32B38/0032 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
B32B2305/20 (EP,US);
B32B2307/51 (EP,US);
B32B2310/028 (EP,US);
B32B37/153 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1093 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1097 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/31] | B32B27/10, B32B5/26, B32B31/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/25] |
Former [2004/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | ||
Former [2004/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, LI | ||
Former [2004/17] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer elastischen, luftdurchlässigen Verbundfolie | [2003/31] | English: | Process for the preparation of an elastic breathable composite sheet | [2003/31] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'une feuille composite élastique respirante | [2003/31] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 31.01.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.05.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/39] | IT | 16.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE4238541 (AMOCO FABRICS ZWEIGNIEDERLASSU [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - column 6, line 15 * * column 2, lines 33-52 * * column 4, lines 39-48 * * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 2 *; | [AD]US5554246 (ANWYLL JR JAMES [US]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5789065 (HAFFNER WILLIAM BELA [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,7* the whole document *; | [YD]WO0154900 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [YD] 1-7 * abstract * * page 9, lines 29-31 * * page 13, line 20 - page 14, line 14 * * page 4, line 24 - page 14, line 18 * | Examination | US3949127 | US5879494 | EP1112823 |