EP1437815 - Power supply voltage selection circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2006/34] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baglin, Thomas Jean Ludovic 9, rue des Petits Ponts Bat 17 06250 Mougins le Haut / FR | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | Epping Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03000268.7 | 08.01.2003 | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1437815 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1437815 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02J9/06, H03K19/007 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
H03K17/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [2005/14] |
Former [2004/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stromversorgungsauswahlschaltung | [2004/29] | English: | Power supply voltage selection circuit | [2004/29] | French: | Circuit de sélection d'alimentation | [2004/29] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 15.01.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.05.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.02.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2006 | GB | 08.01.2007 | [2007/51] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 23.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07170676 ; | [A]US4017779 (MCDONALD JAMES ANTHONY, et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE4242552 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, & JP07170676 A 19950704 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |