EP1327816 - Toroidal vessel, particularly for propane-butane liquefied gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2005 [2005/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Staniuk, Jacek ul. Konarskiego 14/23 76-200 Slupsk / PL | [2003/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/29] | Representative(s) | Meyer, Ludgerus Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | Meyer, Ludgerus A. Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03000282.8 | 09.01.2003 | [2003/29] | Priority number, date | PL20020351665 | 11.01.2002 Original published format: PL 35166502 | [2003/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1327816 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1327816 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F17C1/00, B60K15/01 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
F17C13/04 (EP);
F17C1/00 (EP);
F17C13/002 (EP);
F17C2201/0133 (EP);
F17C2201/056 (EP);
F17C2203/0617 (EP);
F17C2205/0323 (EP);
F17C2205/0352 (EP);
F17C2205/0385 (EP);
F17C2221/035 (EP);
F17C2223/0153 (EP);
F17C2223/033 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2003/29] | F17C1/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/16] |
Former [2003/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Toroidaler Tank, insbesondere für Propan-Butan Flüssiggas | [2003/29] | English: | Toroidal vessel, particularly for propane-butane liquefied gas | [2003/29] | French: | Réservoir toroidal, en particulier pour gaz liquéfiés butane propane | [2003/29] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/42] | 20.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.03.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.03.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5488970 (CIPPITANI LUCIANO [IT]) [X] 1-5 * columns 2-3 *; | [X]WO9703856 (ICOM SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 8 * * page 5, paragraphs 1,2,4 *; | [X]WO9709561 (ROBINSON DONALD SCOTT [AU]) [X] 1-5 * page 11, paragraph 4; figure 3 *; | [X]FR2756516 (BARABINO ALPHONSE [FR]) [X] 1-5 * page 2; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0969243 (STANIUK MICHAEL [PL]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0009]; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0969242 (STANIUK MICHAEL [PL]) [X] 1-5 * figure 1 *; | [X]US6192918 (JAASMA SERVATIUS ALFONS MARIA [NL], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 2, lines 13-34,53-67 *; | [E]EP1291221 (FLII GHEZZI S R L [IT]) [E] 1-5* column 2; figure 1 * |