EP1327954 - Systems and methods for distributed administration of public and private electronic markets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department Xerox Square - 20 A 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, NY 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department, Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bell, David G. 243 Cowper Street Palo Alto, California 94301 / US | 02 /
Liang, Anthony T. 3864 Springfield Common Fremont, Ca 94555 / US | 03 /
Garnaat, Mitchell 6760 Springdale CT Victor, NY 14564-9579 / US | 04 /
Brun-Cottan, Francoise 11 Buttermilk Hill Road Pittsford, New York 14534 / US | [2003/29] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03000540.9 | 09.01.2003 | [2003/29] | Priority number, date | US20020042963 | 09.01.2002 Original published format: US 42963 | [2003/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1327954 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1327954 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2003/29] | CPC: |
G06Q30/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/49] |
Former [2003/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zur verteilten Verwaltung von privaten und öffentlichen elektronischen Märkten | [2003/29] | English: | Systems and methods for distributed administration of public and private electronic markets | [2003/29] | French: | Systèmes et procédés pour administration distribuée de marchés électroniques, publics et privés | [2003/29] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 23.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/52] | 25.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search |