EP1329682 - Integrated fluid reservoir and heat exchanger ducts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clark Equipment Company 200 Chestnut Ridge Road P.O. Box 8738 Woodcliff Lake New Jersey 07675-8738 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states Clark Equipment Company 200 Chestnut Ridge Road, P.O.Box 8738 Woodcliff Lake New Jersey 07675-8738 / US | ||
Former [2003/30] | For all designated states Clark Equipment Company 200 Chestnut Ridge Road, P.O.Box 8738 Woodcliff Lake, New Jersey 07675-8738 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Albright, Larry E. 162 Maplewood Drive Gwinner, North Dakota 58040 / US | 02 /
Hoechst, Lonnie D. P.O. Box 453 Gwinner, North Dakota 58040 / US | 03 /
Frederick, Dan A. 464 So. 4th Street Forman, North Dakota 58032 / US | [2003/30] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/30] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03000659.7 | 16.01.2003 | [2003/30] | Priority number, date | US20020349391P | 18.01.2002 Original published format: US 349391 P | US20020123826 | 15.04.2002 Original published format: US 123826 | [2003/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1329682 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1329682 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | [2005/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1329682 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/00, F28D1/04 | [2003/30] | CPC: |
E02F9/0883 (EP,US);
F01P11/029 (EP,US);
F28D1/0435 (EP,US);
F01P2003/187 (EP,US);
F01P2060/04 (EP,US);
F01P2060/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/27] |
Former [2003/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Integrierter Flüssigkeitsbehäter und Wärmetauscherrohre | [2007/32] | English: | Integrated fluid reservoir and heat exchanger ducts | [2003/30] | French: | Conduits d'échange de chaleur et réservoir pour fluides intégrés | [2003/30] |
Former [2003/30] | Integrierte Wärmetauscherrohren und Flüssigkeitsbehälter | Examination procedure | 26.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 29.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 22.08.2007 | [2008/21] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6394019 ; | [A]US4441463 (REST HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1,9* abstract *; | [DA]US5649587 (PLANT WILLIAM DAVID [US]) [DA] 1,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880908), vol. 012, no. 332, Database accession no. (M - 738), & JP63094019 A 19880425 (NIPPON DENSO CO LTD) [A] 1,9 * abstract * | by applicant | US5649587 |