EP1311029 - High density connector and method of manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FCI 145/147 Rue Yves Le Coz 78000 Versailles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states FCI 145/147 rue Yves Le Coz 78000 Versailles / FR | ||
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states FCI 53, rue de Châteaudun 75009 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lemke, Timothy A. 130 Spring Drive Rd. Dillsburg, Pennsylvania 17019 / US | 02 /
Houtz, Timothy W. 1905 Valley Green Rd. Etters, Pennsylvania 17319 / US | [2003/20] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03000661.3 | 10.10.1997 | [2003/20] | Priority number, date | US19960728194 | 10.10.1996 Original published format: US 728194 | US19960777579 | 31.12.1996 Original published format: US 777579 | US19960778380 | 31.12.1996 Original published format: US 778380 | US19960778398 | 31.12.1996 Original published format: US 778398 | US19960777806 | 31.12.1996 Original published format: US 777806 | [2003/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1311029 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1311029 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/32 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
H01R43/0256 (EP);
H01R12/707 (EP);
H01R12/716 (EP);
H01R13/41 (EP);
H01R4/028 (EP);
H01R43/20 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP);
H05K3/3426 (EP);
H05K3/3478 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [2003/20] | Title | German: | Steckverbinder hoher Kontaktdichte und Herstellungsverfahren | [2003/20] | English: | High density connector and method of manufacture | [2003/20] | French: | Connecteur à haute densité et procedé de fabrication | [2003/20] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 23.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97117583.1 / EP0836243 | Divisional application(s) | EP05020003.9 / EP1617519 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2006 | BE | 13.09.2006 | CH | 13.09.2006 | LI | 13.09.2006 | NL | 13.09.2006 | DK | 13.12.2006 | ES | 24.12.2006 | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/39] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
LI | 13.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0534223 (HERCULES DEFENSE ELECTRONICS S [US]); | [A]US5358417 (SCHMEDDING GEORGE R [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 39 *; | [A]US5515604 (HORINE DAVID A [US], et al); | [E]WO9815990 (BERG TECH INC [US], et al) [E] 1-7* page 8 - page 18 *; | [E]EP0843383 (BERG ELECTRONICS MFG [NL]) [E] 1-5,7 * column 5, line 37 - column 13, line 25 * |