EP1327673 - Low torque grease composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2006 | Refusal of application | published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINEBEA Co., Ltd. 4106-73 Miyota, Miyota-machi Kitasaku-gun Kitasaku-gun, Nagano-ken 389-0293 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | For all designated states Minebea Co., Ltd. 4106-73 Miyota, Miyota-machi Kitasaku-gun, 389-0293 Nagano-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akiyama, Motoharu Minebea Co., Ltd., 4106-73 Miyota, Miyota-machi Kitasaku-gun, Nagano-ken 389-0293 / JP | 02 /
Hashimoto, Tatsuya NOK Cluver Corp. 955-4 Isohara Aza Oishi Isohara- Cho, Ibaraki-shi, Ibaraki-ken 319-1541 / JP | [2003/37] |
Former [2003/29] | 01 /
Akiyama, Motoharu Minebea Co., Ltd., 4106-73 Miyota, Miyota-machi Kitasaku-gun, Nagano-ken 389-0293 / JP | ||
02 /
Hashimoto, Tatsuya 12-15, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-0012 / JP | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03000725.6 | 13.01.2003 | [2003/29] | Priority number, date | JP20020006792 | 15.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002006792 | [2003/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1327673 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C10M169/02, // (C10M169/02, 107:38, 119:22), C10N20:02, C10N40:02, C10N50:10 | [2003/29] | CPC: |
C10M169/02 (EP,US);
C10M131/10 (KR);
C10M2213/0606 (EP,US);
C10M2213/0626 (EP,US);
C10N2020/02 (EP,US);
C10N2020/06 (EP,US);
C10N2040/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/15] |
Former [2003/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schmierfettzusammensetzung für niedriges Drehmoment | [2003/29] | English: | Low torque grease composition | [2003/29] | French: | Composition de graisse pour faible moment de torsion | [2003/29] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 17.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/30] | 10.02.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/30] | 01.03.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.02.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0856570 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [X] 1,6,7 * page 3, line 1 - line 27; example 1; claims 1-10 * [A] 2-5; | [A]US5948737 (SRINIVASAN PADMANABHAN [IT], et al) [A] 1-7* column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 16; claims 1-14; tables 1,2 *; | [A]US6329326 (ISO KENICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |