EP1300642 - Capillary dewatering method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah WI 54956 / US | ||
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | ||
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chuang, Strong C. 915 Cambridge Court Appleton, WI 54915 / US | 02 /
Kaufman, Kenneth 2030 Knightsbridge Way Alpharetta, GA 30004 / US | 03 /
Schiesser, Robert H. 1834 Mare Road Warrington, PA 18976 / US | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/03] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/15] | Hinkelmann, Klaus, et al Diehl Glaeser Hiltl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03000741.3 | 31.10.1995 | [2003/15] | Priority number, date | US19940344219 | 23.11.1994 Original published format: US 344219 | [2003/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1300642 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1300642 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1300642 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D21F3/10 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
D21F11/145 (EP,US);
D21F11/14 (EP,US);
D21F5/143 (EP,US);
F26B13/24 (EP,US);
F26B13/26 (EP,US);
F26B13/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/15] | F26B13/30, D21F3/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/33] |
Former [2003/15] | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kapillarentwässerung | [2003/15] | English: | Capillary dewatering method and apparatus | [2003/15] | French: | Procédé et appareil d'essorage capillaire | [2003/15] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/15] | 03.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95939031.1 / EP0740765 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4584058 (LEHTINEN ANTTI [FI], et al) [AD] 1,17* column W * |