EP1342941 - Device for producing a counterforce on a selector shaft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG 70546 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states INA-Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1 - 3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG 70546 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states INA-Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1 - 3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krämer, Klaus Am Löhlein 5 91460 Baudenbach / DE | [2003/37] | Representative(s) | Blaumeier, Jörg Lindner Blaumeier Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Blaumeier, Jörg Lindner, Blaumeier & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 119109 90101 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2005/21] | LINDNER BLAUMEIER & KOLLEGEN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 11 91 09 90101 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03000898.1 | 16.01.2003 | [2003/37] | Priority number, date | DE2002109730 | 06.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10209730 | [2003/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1342941 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1342941 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | [2005/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1342941 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/18, F16H61/24, F16H63/30 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
F16H61/24 (EP);
F16H63/30 (KR);
F16H63/20 (EP);
F16H2061/245 (EP);
F16H61/18 (EP);
F16H63/302 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [2005/52] |
Former [2003/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Erzeugen einer Gegenkraft an einer Schaltwelle | [2003/37] | English: | Device for producing a counterforce on a selector shaft | [2003/37] | French: | Dispositif pour produire une force antagoniste pour un arbre de commande | [2003/37] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 05.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/39] | IT | 16.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4583418 (NAKAYAMA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 5, line 42 - line 68 * * column 6, line 26 - column 7, line 6 * * figures 1,2,8A-9C *; | [A]DE19520209 (AISIN A I CO [JP]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 5, line 17 - column 7, line 19 ** figures 1,6,7 *; | [AD]EP0849506 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10016364 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 59 * * figures 1,6A-6E * | by applicant | EP0849506 |