EP1331488 - Tuning compensation for automated nmr analysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Varian, Inc. 3120 Hansen Way Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2003/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cosman, Jason W. 107 South Mary Avenue, Apt. 63 Sunnyvale, CA Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2003/31] | Representative(s) | Käck, Jürgen Patentanwälte Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | Käck, Jürgen Kahler Käck Mollekopf Patentanwälte Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03001205.8 | 17.01.2003 | [2003/31] | Priority number, date | US20020061027 | 29.01.2002 Original published format: US 61027 | [2003/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1331488 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1331488 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/30 | [2003/31] | CPC: |
G01R33/30 (EP,US);
G01R33/3628 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2005/43] |
Former [2003/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kompensation der Frequenzabstimmung in automatischen NMR-Analysen | [2003/31] | English: | Tuning compensation for automated nmr analysis | [2003/31] | French: | Compensation du réglage de la fréquence dans des analyses RMN automatiques | [2003/31] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/20] | 09.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/46] | 25.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5831434 (SHIGEZANE MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,23,25,39,41,42,45-48* column 1, line 21 - line 63 *; | [AD]US6204665 (TRIEBE RENE [CH], et al) [AD] 1-48 * column 1, line 30 - line 52 * * column 2, line 5 - line 14 * |