EP1304129 - Recyclable medication dispensing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burroughs, Andrew 7404 7th Avenue Kenosha, Wisconsin 53143 / US | 02 /
Hixson, David 2358 Eagleview Circle Longmont Colorado 80504 / US | 03 /
Hodge, Andrew 655 Kansas Street, Apt. 603 San Fransisco, California 94107 / US | [2003/31] |
Former [2003/17] | 01 /
Burroughs, Andrew 7404 7th Avenue Kenosha, Wisconsin 53143 / US | ||
02 /
Hixson, David 1112 Oak Avenue Evanston, Illinois 60202 / US | |||
03 /
Hodge, Andrew 655 Kansas Street, Apt. 603 San Fransisco, California 94107 / US | Representative(s) | Kent, Lindsey Ruth, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited 8 Arlington Square West Downshire Way Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 1PU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Kent, Lindsey Ruth, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Center Erl Wood Manor Sunninghill Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | ||
Former [2003/17] | Kent, Lindsey Ruth, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited, European Patent Operations, Lilly Research Centre, Sunninghill Road Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03001272.8 | 06.03.1996 | [2003/17] | Priority number, date | US19950399764 | 07.03.1995 Original published format: US 399764 | [2003/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1304129 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1304129 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
A61M5/31551 (EP,US);
A61M5/3158 (EP,US);
A61M2205/581 (EP,US);
A61M2205/582 (EP,US);
A61M5/24 (EP,US);
A61M5/31535 (EP,US);
A61M5/31541 (EP,US);
A61M5/31556 (EP,US);
A61M5/3156 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2003/17] | Extension states | AL | 23.05.2006 | LT | 23.05.2006 | LV | 23.05.2006 | SI | 23.05.2006 | Title | German: | Wiederverwendbare Abgabevorrichtung für Medikamente | [2003/17] | English: | Recyclable medication dispensing device | [2003/17] | French: | Appareil recyclable de distribution de médicaments | [2003/17] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 19.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/25] | 27.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/25] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96301540.9 / EP0730876 | EP98202729.4 / EP0879610 | Request for further processing for: | 16.05.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 16.05.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.06.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0268191 (HASELMEIER WILHELM FA [DE]) [X] 6,7 * the whole document * [A] 12 [Y] 1,2,4,5; | [XA]WO8808723 (HASELMEIER WILHELM FA [DE]) [X] 6,7 * page 9, line 24 - page 14, line 21; figure - * [A] 12,1,2; | [XA]EP0295075 (HYPOGUARD UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1,4-6,9,10 * column 12, line 65 - column 13, line 7 * * column 15, line 2 - line 53 * * figure - * [A] 12; | [Y]WO9110460 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [Y] 1,2,4,5 * page 5, paragraph L; figure - *; | [A]WO9218179 (MEDICO DEV INVESTMENT CO [CH]) [A] 1,4 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [XA]EP0525525 (MEDICO DEV INVESTMENT CO [CH]) [X] 6 * the whole document * [A] 1,12; | [A]WO9310838 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]EP0554995 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1-10,12 * column W *; | [XA]WO9422507 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [X] 11 * page 16, line 10 - page 17, line 26 * * page 28, line 3 - line 20 * * figures 23,24,55 * [A] 12 | by applicant | US5295976 | US5308340 |