EP1335406 - Metal halide lamp and lighting system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): BE | published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/01] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | |||
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | |||
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571-8686 / JP | |||
Former [2003/33] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571-8686 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhu, Huiling 101 Kendall Road Lexington, MA 02421 / US | 02 /
Ukekawa, Shin 3-16-18 Matsuigaoka Kyotanabe-shi, Kyoto 610-0353 / JP | 03 /
Nohara, Hiroshi 3-18 Otani-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 662-0054 / JP | 04 /
Maya, Jakob 25 Marshal Street Brookline, MA 02446 / US | [2003/33] | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [2015/02] |
Former [2003/33] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 03001351.0 | 24.01.2003 | [2003/33] | Priority number, date | US20020062078 | 31.01.2002 Original published format: US 62078 | [2003/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1335406 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1335406 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | [2006/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1335406 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/82, H01J61/12, H01J61/30, H01J61/04, H01J61/34, H01J61/36, H01J61/073 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
H01J61/125 (EP,US);
H01J61/045 (EP,US);
H01J61/30 (EP,US);
H01J61/827 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE [2006/52] |
Former [2003/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Metallhalogenidlampe und Beleuchtungssystem | [2003/33] | English: | Metal halide lamp and lighting system | [2003/33] | French: | Lampe aux halogénures métalliques et système d' éclairage | [2003/33] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 22.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.09.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2006 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 07.01.2015 | [2016/24] |
Former [2015/30] | BE | 31.01.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4422011 (BRUNINX-POESEN LEONCE M J [NL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 1 - column 4; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0443675 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1,2,4,6,10* figures 1-3; table 1 *; | [A]EP0678898 (USHIO ELECTRIC INC [JP]) [A] 1,9 * column 1, line 5 * * column 4, line 28 - line 44 *; | [Y]US5973453 (VAN VLIET JOHANNES A J M [NL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US6300729 (KEIJSER ROBERTUS ANTONIUS J [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |