EP1335124 - Air filter for a combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.Ing. H.C. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Dr.Ing. h.c.F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2003/33] | For all designated states Dr.Ing. h.c.F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holle, Roger Höhenstrasse 24 75433 Maulbronn / DE | 02 /
Wessels, Michael Ölmühle 2 71287 Weissach / DE | 03 /
Müller, Bernd Appenbergstrasse 18 71297 Mönsheim / DE | [2003/33] | Application number, filing date | 03001407.0 | 22.01.2003 | [2003/33] | Priority number, date | DE2002105416 | 09.02.2002 Original published format: DE 10205416 | DE2002113604 | 27.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10213604 | [2003/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1335124 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1335124 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02M35/14 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
G10K11/22 (EP,US);
F02M35/02 (EP,US);
F02M35/10013 (EP,US);
F02M35/1294 (EP,US);
F02M35/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/19] |
Former [2003/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Luftfilter für eine Brennkraftmaschine | [2003/33] | English: | Air filter for a combustion engine | [2003/33] | French: | Filtre à air pour un moteur à combustion | [2003/33] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 30.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH10339225 ; | [A]DE1052169 (SIGISMOND WILMAN) [A] 1* column 3, line 16 - line 46; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0242797 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 18 - page 6, line 14; figure 2 *; | [X]DE19811051 (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE]) [X] 1,5,6 * column 4, line 39 - line 67 * * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 35; figures 1,2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10339225 A 19981222 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,5,6 * abstract * |