EP1331696 - Manufacturing method of an electrical press-fit connector pin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/31] | Electrical press-fitt connector and producing method | ||
[2011/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.2013 [2013/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRIWO Gerätebau GmbH von-Liebig-Strasse 11 48346 Ostbevern / DE | [2003/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steiert, Thomas Am Friedhof 8 48346 Ostbevern / DE | 02 /
Bothe, Michael In der Weede 154 48163 Münster / DE | 03 /
van gen Hassend, Kay Dorbaumstrasse 86 48157 Münster / DE | [2003/31] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03001620.8 | 24.01.2003 | [2003/31] | Priority number, date | DE2002103171 | 28.01.2002 Original published format: DE 10203171 | DE2002103173 | 28.01.2002 Original published format: DE 10203173 | [2003/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1331696 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1331696 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | [2004/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1331696 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01R24/28, H01R103/00, H01R43/16, H01R13/04, H01R13/44, H01R13/405 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
H01R43/16 (EP);
H01R13/405 (EP);
H01R13/44 (EP);
H01R13/6658 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP);
H01R24/28 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/42] | H01R43/16, H01R13/405, H01R13/44, H01R13/04, H01R19/04 | ||
Former IPC [2003/31] | H01R12/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, ES, FR, IT, LI [2005/27] |
Former [2003/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren eines elektrischen Steckerstifts | [2012/22] | English: | Manufacturing method of an electrical press-fit connector pin | [2011/31] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une tige de connection électrique pour insertion à force | [2012/21] |
Former [2003/31] | Elektrischer Steckerstift und Herstellungsverfahren | ||
Former [2003/31] | Electrical press-fitt connector and producing method | ||
Former [2003/31] | Tige de connection électrique pour insertion à force et procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 22.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 22.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2005 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]GB937579 (OXLEY ROBERT FREDERICK) [X] 1,2,6,16 * the whole document * [A] 20 [Y] 2-5,8,9,17-19; | [X]FR1386635 (AMP INC) [X] 1,10,13,16 * page 5; figures 12,13,19 *; | [X]DE3202747 (KRUPS STIFTUNG [DE]) [X] 1,2,8,9,14,16 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE8633492U (LI, HUO-LI) [Y] 2-5,8,9,17-19 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2186747 (ON TAT BAKELITE ELECTRIC WORKS) [X] 1,2,8,16 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3840140 (TALLER GMBH [DE]) [A] 6,7,20* figure 2 *; | [X]EP0542652 (POSSEHL ELECTRONIC FRANCE SA [FR]) [X] 1,10,13,16 * figure 4 * | Examination | GB818006 |