EP1331478 - Method for the detection of the concentration of NOx in exhaust gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2012/28] |
Former [2003/31] | For all designated states Volkswagen AG 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hahn, Hermann, Dr.-Ing. Siegesstrasse 7 30175 Hannover / DE | 02 /
Schlüter, Jens Am Schulplatz 2 32351 Stemwede / DE | [2003/31] | Representative(s) | Pohlmann, Bernd Michael RPK Patentanwälte Reinhardt, Pohlmann und Kaufmann Partnerschaft mbB Rossmarkt 12 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2016/03] |
Former [2009/52] | Pohlmann, Bernd Michael Reinhardt & Pohlmann Patentanwälte Rossmarkt 12 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2003/31] | Pohlmann, Bernd Michael, Dr. Reinhardt & Pohlmann Partnerschaft Günthersburgallee 40 60316 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 03001639.8 | 24.01.2003 | [2003/31] | Priority number, date | DE2002102859 | 24.01.2002 Original published format: DE 10202859 | [2003/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1331478 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1331478 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/417, G01N27/419, G01N27/407, G01N33/00, F01N11/00 | [2003/31] | CPC: |
G01N27/419 (EP);
G01N27/4175 (EP);
F01N2560/026 (EP);
G01N33/0037 (EP);
Y02A50/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2003/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung der NOx-Konzentration in Abgasen | [2003/31] | English: | Method for the detection of the concentration of NOx in exhaust gas | [2003/31] | French: | Procédé pour déterminer la concentration de NOx dans des gaz d'échappement | [2003/31] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 26.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.01.2003 | CY | 20.01.2016 | CZ | 20.01.2016 | DK | 20.01.2016 | EE | 20.01.2016 | ES | 20.01.2016 | FI | 20.01.2016 | IT | 20.01.2016 | MC | 20.01.2016 | NL | 20.01.2016 | SE | 20.01.2016 | SI | 20.01.2016 | SK | 20.01.2016 | TR | 20.01.2016 | AT | 24.01.2016 | IE | 24.01.2016 | LU | 24.01.2016 | BE | 31.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | GR | 21.04.2016 | PT | 20.05.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 24.01.2003 | |
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
AT | 24.01.2016 | ||
IE | 24.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
AT | 24.01.2016 | ||
IE | 24.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | CZ | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 24.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 24.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 20.01.2016 | |
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 20.01.2016 | |
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | BE | 31.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4601276 (DAMSON ECKART [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0841562 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0937979 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE19819462 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1-4,9-12,14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0995986 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7,9,10,12,14,15 * abstract * * column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 53 * * column 8, line 16 - column 18, line 56 * * column 28, line 37 - column 29, line 48 *; | [A]EP0999442 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4,6,7,9,10 * abstract * * page 1, column 46 - page 4, column 21 * * page 9, line 1 - page 16, line 40 *; | [A]EP1026501 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1074833 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * page 13, line 15 - page 14, line 55; figures 12,13 *; | [X]US6290829 (KATO NOBUHIDE [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,9,11,12 * abstract * * column 5, line 59 - column 12, line 34 *; | [PA]DE10049685 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [PA] 1-15* the whole document * | by applicant | EP0999442 | EP1026501 |