EP1336335 - Pneumatic pulsator for milking plants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERPULS S.P.A. Via A. Varisco, 18 42020 Albinea Reggio Emilia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states INTERPULS S.P.A. Via A. Varisco, 18 42020 Albinea, Reggio Emilia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sicuri, Roberto Via Moletolo, 159 43100 Parma / IT | 02 /
Nicolini, Gabriele Via Righi, 7 42042 Fabbrico Reggio Emilia / IT | [2003/34] | Representative(s) | Giambrocono, Alfonso, et al Giambrocono & C. S.p.A. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | Giambrocono, Alfonso, Dr. Ing., et al Ing. A. Giambrocono & C. S.r.l. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03001709.9 | 27.01.2003 | [2003/34] | Priority number, date | IT2002MI00317 | 18.02.2002 Original published format: IT MI20020317 | [2003/34] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1336335 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1336335 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01J5/12 | [2003/34] | CPC: |
A01J5/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/32] |
Former [2003/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Pneumatisch Pulsator für Melkanlage | [2003/34] | English: | Pneumatic pulsator for milking plants | [2003/34] | French: | Pulsateur pneumatique pour installations de traite | [2003/34] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/08] | 07.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.06.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.06.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0009282 (LIGABUE INTERPULS SNC [IT]) [DA] 1,7-9* page 3, lines 29-36; figure 2; claim 1 * | by applicant | EP0009282 | EP0009289 | ITMI990323U |