EP1333663 - Photographing apparatus and photographing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2015/28] |
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ojima, Noriaki, @c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
Shiraishi, Kenji, @c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 03 /
Nakahira, Toshiaki, @c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2015/28] |
Former [2003/32] | 01 /
Ojima, Noriaki, c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | ||
02 /
Shiraishi, Kenji, c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | |||
03 /
Nakahira, Toshiaki, c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/28] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/32] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03002112.5 | 30.01.2003 | [2003/32] | Priority number, date | JP20020021416 | 30.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002021416 | JP20020079081 | 20.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002079081 | JP20020021419 | 30.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002021419 | JP20020163011 | 04.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002163011 | JP20020130271 | 02.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002130271 | [2015/43] |
Former [2003/32] | JP20020021416 | 30.01.2002 | |
JP20020079081 | 20.03.2002 | ||
JP20020021419 | 30.01.2002 | ||
JP20020080313 | 22.03.2002 | ||
JP20020163011 | 04.06.2002 | ||
JP20020130271 | 02.05.2002 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1333663 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1333663 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1333663 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1333663 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/73, H04N5/345, H04N9/04 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
H04N25/68 (EP);
H04N23/84 (EP,US);
H04N25/134 (EP,US);
H04N25/136 (EP,US);
H04N25/447 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/32] | H04N3/15 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2015/28] |
Former [2004/39] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL | ||
Former [2003/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildaufnahmevorrichtung und -verfahren | [2003/32] | English: | Photographing apparatus and photographing method | [2003/32] | French: | Caméra et procédé de prise de vues | [2003/32] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 03.07.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.10.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 12.08.2015 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2007 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.08.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 08.07.2015 | IT | 08.07.2015 | NL | 08.07.2015 | [2017/40] |
Former [2016/21] | ES | 08.07.2015 | |
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 08.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0840503 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 21,35,43 * column 6, lines 5-14; figure 4 * * column 16, lines 28-43; figure 1 *[A] 1,2,11,12 | Examination | US4821088 | JP2000236473 | by applicant | JP2000236473 |