EP1369340 - Roofmodule for a car [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Webasto AG Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | [2005/17] |
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states Webasto Vehicle Systems International GmbH Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rudolf, Thomas Inninger Strasse 13 82229 Hechendorf / DE | [2003/50] | Representative(s) | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstraße 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | Schwan - Schwan - Schorer Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/17] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2003/50] | Bedenbecker, Markus Untertaxetweg 88 82131 Gauting / DE | Application number, filing date | 03002393.1 | 04.02.2003 | [2003/50] | Priority number, date | DE20021024970 | 05.06.2002 Original published format: DE 10224970 | [2003/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1369340 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1369340 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/06, B60R13/02, B62D65/14 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
B62D25/06 (EP);
B60R13/0212 (EP);
B60R13/0275 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2007/24] |
Former [2003/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dachmodul für ein Fahrzeug | [2003/50] | English: | Roofmodule for a car | [2003/50] | French: | Module de toit pour véhicule | [2003/50] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 05.04.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/15] | 27.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.05.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3953067 (ISOLA RICHARD A) [A] 1,2,4-6,9,10,12* column 15, lines 20-42; figures 1,2,4,18,23; claims 1,3,25 *; | [A]US4958878 (KEMPKERS GORDON [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP0826555 (FEINPAPPENWERK GEBR SCHUSTER G [DE]) [Y] 4-7,13 * figure 2 *; | [DXAY]EP0964814 (MERITOR AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-3,10,11,15-19 * column 11, lines 34,35; claims 1,4,9,12 * [A] 9,12 [Y] 4-7,13; | [X]DE10048130 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,8,9,15,16 * figures 1-3 * |