EP1335396 - Collision detection apparatus designed to minimize contact chatter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/33] | For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Masatada, Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Dept., 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Kyojiro, Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Dept., 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | [2003/33] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2003/33] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro, Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 03002394.9 | 04.02.2003 | [2003/33] | Priority number, date | JP20020030982 | 07.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002030982 | JP20020031026 | 07.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002031026 | [2003/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1335396 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01H1/50 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
H01H1/50 (EP,US);
H01H1/26 (EP,US);
H01H35/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/19] |
Former [2003/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zusammenstosserkennungsvorrichtung zur Minimierung von Kontaktstörungen durch Erschütterungen | [2003/33] | English: | Collision detection apparatus designed to minimize contact chatter | [2003/33] | French: | Appareil de détection de collisions designé pour minimiser la vibration des contacts | [2003/33] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 24.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/05] | 01.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2120980 (LEITH JOHNSTON) [Y] 3 * figure 3 *; | [Y]FR1415375 (HAWKER SIDDELEY DYNAMICS LTD) [Y] 4* figure 2 *; | [Y]DE2058864 (SIEMENS AG) [Y] 2,4 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 8; figures 2,4 *; | [Y]GB2128410 (GEN ELECTRIC CO PLC) [Y] 1,2,5 * page 1, line 75 - line 79; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5034580 (TADA TATSUO [JP], et al) [Y] 6,7 * abstract *; | [YD]US5898144 (SAKAI MAKOTO [JP], et al) [YD] 1-7 * the whole document * |