EP1357465 - Storage system having virtualized resource [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.08.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arakawa, Hiroshi, Hitachi, Ltd. Intell.Prop.Grp. New Marunouchi Bldg. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Oeda, Takashi, Hitachi, Ltd. Intell.Prop.Grp. New Marunouchi Bldg. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Matsunami, Naoto, Hitachi, Ltd. Intell.Prop.Grp. New Marunouchi Bldg. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Ito, Ryusuke, Hitachi, Ltd. Intell.Prop.Grp. New Marunouchi Bldg. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2003/44] | Application number, filing date | 03002668.6 | 11.02.2003 | [2003/44] | Priority number, date | JP20020125168 | 26.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002125168 | [2003/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1357465 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1357465 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
G06F21/80 (EP,US);
G06F11/1458 (EP,US);
G06F16/10 (EP,US);
G06F3/0605 (EP,US);
G06F3/0629 (EP,US);
G06F3/0659 (EP,US);
G06F3/0665 (EP,US);
G06F3/067 (EP,US);
H04L67/1095 (EP,US);
H04L67/1097 (EP,US);
G06F11/1456 (EP,US);
G06F11/1464 (EP,US);
G06F11/1466 (EP,US);
G06F11/2064 (EP,US);
G06F11/2082 (EP,US);
G06F2201/80 (EP,US);
G06F2201/84 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99939 (US);
Y10S707/99953 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE [2009/03] |
Former [2003/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Speichervorrichtung mit einem virtuellen Mittel | [2003/44] | English: | Storage system having virtualized resource | [2003/44] | French: | Système de stockage ayant une ressource virtualisée | [2003/44] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 08.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 16.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 09.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.06.2013 | 26.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/38] | 06.05.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/38] | 04.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5682509 (KABENJIAN GREGORY V [US]) [X] 1-4,9,10,12,13,17-20 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 28 * * column 4, line 14 - line 19; figure 1 * * column 4, line 36 - line 55; figure 2 * * column 6, line 41 - line 55 * * column 7, line 34 - line 37 * * column 12, line 45 - line 53 * * column 12, line 65 - column 14, line 7 * [A] 6; | [X]US5875479 (BLOUNT LAWRENCE CARTER [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 3, line 1 - line 37 * * column 5, line 14 - line 24 * * column 6, line 16 - line 49 *; | [X]WO0182083 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 4, line 9 - line 23 * * page 5, line 5 - line 9 * * page 6, line 14 - line 30 * * page 11, line 11 - line 17 * * page 12, line 1 - line 5 * * page 12, line 21 - line 28; figure 5 * * page 13, line 21 - line 23 * * page 14, line 20 - page 15, line 2 *; | [A]US2001052051 (KIM YOUNG-GEY [KR], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0045] *; | [A] - "CONCURRENT COPY", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19940401), vol. 37, no. 4B, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 145 - 147, XP000451203 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | Examination | US2001054093 | by applicant | US5682509 | JPH10333839 | US5875479 | JP2000276406 | WO0182083 |