EP1313039 - X.500 System and methods providing data tolerance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CA, Inc. One Computer Associates Plaza Islandia, NY 11749 / US | [2013/03] |
Former [2013/02] | For all designated states Computer Associates Think, Inc. One Computer Associates Plaza Islandia, New York 11749 / US | ||
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states Computer Associates Think, Inc. One Computer Associates Plaza Islandia, New York 11749 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harvey, Richard Hans 4 Odette Court Ringwood, VIC 3134 / AU | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2003/21] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R G C Jenkins &Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03002798.1 | 30.08.1995 | [2003/21] | Priority number, date | AU1994PM07842 | 01.09.1994 Original published format: AU PM784294 | AU1994PM09586 | 21.11.1994 Original published format: AU PM958694 | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1313039 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1313039 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | [2005/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1313039 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, H04L29/12 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
G06F16/284 (EP,US);
H04L61/4552 (EP,US);
G06F16/288 (EP,US);
G06F16/289 (EP,US);
H04L61/4517 (EP,US);
H04L61/4523 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99931 (US);
Y10S707/99933 (US);
Y10S707/99934 (US);
|
Former IPC [2003/21] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/21] | Title | German: | X.500-Systeme und entsprechende Methoden mit Bereitstellung einer Datentoleranz | [2003/21] | English: | X.500 System and methods providing data tolerance | [2003/21] | French: | Système et procédé de X.500 fournissant tolérance de données | [2003/21] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 11.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95930331.4 / EP0777883 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19950930331) is 12.01.1999 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.01.2013 | BE | 09.01.2013 | DK | 09.01.2013 | IT | 09.01.2013 | MC | 09.01.2013 | NL | 09.01.2013 | SE | 09.01.2013 | GR | 10.04.2013 | ES | 20.04.2013 | PT | 09.05.2013 | GB | 30.08.2013 | IE | 30.08.2013 | LU | 30.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | FR | 02.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/37] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
GB | 30.08.2013 | ||
IE | 30.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
FR | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
GB | 30.08.2013 | ||
IE | 30.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
IE | 30.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 09.01.2013 | |
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 09.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5291583 (BAPAT SUBODH [US]) [X] 1-6,11,12,15,16,21,24,25 * the whole document *; | [X] - COOKE B E ET AL, "DIRECTORY SERVICES IN THE HP MAP 3.0 ENVIRONMENT", HEWLETT-PACKARD JOURNAL, HEWLETT-PACKARD CO. PALO ALTO, US, (19900801), vol. 41, no. 4, pages 15 - 23, XP000149608 [X] 1-6,15-19,21-25 * the whole document * | [A] - PERRUCHOUD F ET AL, "A RELATIONAL DATA BASE DESIGN FOR AN X.500 DIRECTORY SYSTEM AGENT", MESSAGE HANDLING SYSTEMS AND APPLICATION LAYER COMMUNICATION PROTOCOLS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1991), pages 405 - 418, XP000672000 [A] 1-3,5,6,15,16,21,24,25 * paragraph [03.2] - paragraph [04.4] * | [A] - HUNT R, "CCITT X.500 DIRECTORIES - PRINCIPLES AND APPLICATIONS", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19921201), vol. 15, no. 10, ISSN 0140-3664, pages 636 - 645, XP000321683 [A] 1-6,15,16,21,24,25 * page 638, column 2, line 1 - page 642, column 1, line 45 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0140-3664(92)90116-V | [A] - ISO-IEC, "The Directory: Overview of Concepts, Models and Services X.500", RECOMMENDATION X.500 ISO/IEC 9594-1, XX, XX, (1993), pages I - III,1, XP002273626 [A] 1,2,5,6,15,16,21,24,25 * the whole document * |