EP1335197 - Tribological Test Apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/33] | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Corrias Silvio Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano / IT | 02 /
Faraldi Paolo Corso Marconi 286 18038 Sanremo / IT | 03 /
Stabielli Valter Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano / IT | [2006/03] |
Former [2004/05] | 01 /
Corrias Silvio Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano / IT | ||
02 /
Fasaldi Paolo Corso Marconi 286 18038 Sanremo / IT | |||
03 /
Stabielli Valter Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano / IT | |||
Former [2003/33] | 01 /
Corrias Silvio Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano / IT | ||
02 /
Fasaldi Paolo Corso Marconi 286 18038 Sanremo / IT | |||
03 /
Stabieli Valter Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano / IT | Representative(s) | Cerbaro, Elena, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/33] | Cerbaro, Elena, Dr., et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 03002812.0 | 07.02.2003 | [2003/33] | Priority number, date | IT2002TO00117 | 08.02.2002 Original published format: IT TO20020117 | [2003/33] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1335197 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1335197 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1335197 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N3/56, G01N19/02 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
G01N3/56 (EP,US);
G01N19/02 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0028 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0032 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0073 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0282 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/33] | Title | German: | Tribologischer Test Apparat | [2003/33] | English: | Tribological Test Apparatus | [2003/33] | French: | Appareil de test tribologique | [2003/33] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 21.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.03.2006 | BE | 01.03.2006 | CH | 01.03.2006 | CY | 01.03.2006 | CZ | 01.03.2006 | EE | 01.03.2006 | FI | 01.03.2006 | LI | 01.03.2006 | NL | 01.03.2006 | SI | 01.03.2006 | SK | 01.03.2006 | TR | 01.03.2006 | BG | 01.06.2006 | DK | 01.06.2006 | GR | 02.06.2006 | PT | 01.08.2006 | HU | 02.09.2006 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
BE | 01.03.2006 | ||
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
CY | 01.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2006 | ||
EE | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
SI | 01.03.2006 | ||
SK | 01.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.06.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
GR | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
BE | 01.03.2006 | ||
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2006 | ||
EE | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
SI | 01.03.2006 | ||
SK | 01.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.06.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
GR | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
BE | 01.03.2006 | ||
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
SI | 01.03.2006 | ||
SK | 01.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.06.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
GR | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
BE | 01.03.2006 | ||
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
SI | 01.03.2006 | ||
SK | 01.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.06.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
BE | 01.03.2006 | ||
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
IT | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
SI | 01.03.2006 | ||
SK | 01.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.06.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
BE | 01.03.2006 | ||
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
SI | 01.03.2006 | ||
SK | 01.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.06.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
SI | 01.03.2006 | ||
SK | 01.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.06.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
SI | 01.03.2006 | ||
SK | 01.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
SI | 01.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
SI | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
SI | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 01.03.2006 | |
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
SI | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 01.03.2006 | |
SI | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 01.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4452065 (MINTER MARVIN J [US]) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [A]US4914958 (VAN DAMME ERIC [BE]) [A] 1-27* column 4, line 5 - line 16 *; | [A]US5662546 (TAKATA HIROTOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-27 * column 3, line 16 - line 28; figure 1 *; | [A]US5837882 (BACIGALUPO NELSON [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * column 3, line 8 - line 38 * * column 4, line 7 - line 15; figures 1-3; claim 1 * |