EP1347455 - Contents recording/playback apparatus and contents edit method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Togashi, Yuuichi Toshiba K.K., Intell. Prop. Div. 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
Ogi, Kouichi Toshiba K.K., Intell. Prop. Div. 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2003/48] |
Former [2003/39] | 01 /
Togashi, Yuuichi Toshiba K.K., Intell. Prop. Div. 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | ||
02 /
Ogi, Kouchi Toshiba K.K., Intell. Prop. Div. 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03002827.8 | 07.02.2003 | [2003/39] | Priority number, date | JP20020076940 | 19.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002076940 | [2003/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1347455 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1347455 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/036, G11B27/034, G11B27/10, G11B27/32 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G06F1/1626 (EP,US);
G06F1/1656 (EP,US);
G06F1/1684 (EP,US);
G06F1/1686 (EP,US);
G06F1/1688 (EP,US);
G11B27/11 (EP,US);
G11B27/28 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
H04N5/2621 (EP,US);
H04N5/772 (EP,US);
G11B2220/65 (EP,US);
H04N5/781 (EP,US);
H04N9/7921 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
H04N9/8063 (EP,US);
H04N9/8205 (EP,US);
H04N9/8227 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/39] | G11B27/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/37] |
Former [2003/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Inhaltsaufzeichnungs/wiedergabegerät und Inhaltseditierverfahren | [2003/39] | English: | Contents recording/playback apparatus and contents edit method | [2003/39] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement/reproduction des matières et procédé d'édition des matières | [2003/39] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 04.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/26] | 06.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001057660 ; | [Y]JPH11167583 ; | [Y]US5822492 (WAKUI YOSHIO [JP], et al) [Y] 5,9,14 * abstract * * column 3, line 39 - line 62 *; | [A]EP0930786 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0012] *; | [A]US6243419 (SATOU TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 4,8,13 * abstract *; | [XY]US6353461 (SHORE MORRIS M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,10-12 * abstract * * column 2, line 7 - line 24 * * column 5, line 47 - column 14, line 67 * [Y] 4,5,8,9,13,14 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010605), vol. 2000, no. 19, & JP2001057660 A 20010227 (HITACHI KOKUSAI ELECTRIC INC; NIPPON HOSO KYOKAI | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990930), vol. 1999, no. 11, & JP11167583 A 19990622 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP |