EP1336637 - Gas barrier film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawamura, Koichi, Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000 Kawashiri, Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Kano, Takeyoshi, Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000 Kawashiri, Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Miki, Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000 Kawashiri, Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2003/34] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03003120.7 | 13.02.2003 | [2003/34] | Priority number, date | JP20020036676 | 14.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002036676 | JP20020241739 | 22.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002241739 | [2003/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1336637 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/12, C08J7/16, C08J7/04, B32B27/14 | [2003/34] | CPC: |
B32B27/14 (EP,US);
C08J7/0423 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/048 (EP,US);
C08J7/056 (EP,US);
C08J7/06 (EP,US);
C23C14/024 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31667 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31797 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/34] | Title | German: | Gassperrfilm | [2003/34] | English: | Gas barrier film | [2003/34] | French: | Film formant barrière aux gaz | [2003/34] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 07.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/06] | 27.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH01294244 ; | [X]JP2000025179 ; | JPH01294244 [ ]; | [X]EP0622399 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-17 * page 2, line 42 - page 6, line 49 * * example 4; claims 1-7,13,14 * * page 5, line 39 - line 42 *; | [A]WO0134313 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [A] 1,7,12,18,19 * page 4, line 17 - page 6, line 12 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 02, Database accession no. 1990-012745, XP002241547 & JPH01294244 A 19891128 (CANON KK) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,9,11,12,14,15,17-19 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000025179 A 20000125 (TOYOBO CO LTD) [X] 1,7,12 * abstract * | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP01294244 A 19891128 (CANON INC) [ ] * abstract * |