EP1449536 - Prion proteins (PrP) as therapeutic agents for the treatment of AP-1 associated diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prionics AG Waigstrasse 27a CH-8952 Schlieren / CH | [2004/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frigg, Rico Weite Gasse 5 8001 Zürich / CH | [2004/35] | Representative(s) | Emmel, Thomas Schaefer Emmel Hausfeld Patentanwälte Krohnstieg 43 22415 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | Emmel, Thomas, Dipl.-Biol., Dr. Schaefer & Emmel, Gehölzweg 20 22043 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03003375.7 | 14.02.2003 | [2004/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1449536 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, A61P27/00, A61P25/28, A61P9/10, A61P17/02 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
A61K38/16 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/35] | Title | German: | Prioproteine als therapeutische mittel zur behandlung von AP-1 assoziierten krankheiten | [2004/35] | English: | Prion proteins (PrP) as therapeutic agents for the treatment of AP-1 associated diseases | [2004/35] | French: | Protéines prions comme agents thérapeutiques pour le traitement de maladies associées à AP-1 | [2004/35] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/16] | 11.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/33] | 30.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6379905 (FISHLEIGH ROBERT VINCENT [GB], et al) [X] 1-6,8-10,12-16 * column 2, line 45 - line 49 ** column 13, line 47 - column 14, line 14 *; | [DX]WO0249662 (UNIV MCGILL [CA], et al) [DX] 1-16 * page 2, line 18 - line 21 * * page 3, line 1 - line 12 * * abstract *; | [X]EP1251138 (SCHAETZL HERMANN DR [DE]) [X] 1-6,8-10,12-16 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * |