EP1319651 - 2-Aminopropane-1,3-diol compound, pharmaceutical use thereof and synthetic intermediates therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Pharma Corporation 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0046 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Pharma Corporation 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adachi, Kunitomo Mitsubishi Pharma Corp., 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | 02 /
Aoki, Yoshiyuki Mitsubishi Pharma Corp., 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | 03 /
Hanano, Tokushi Mitsubishi Pharma Corp., 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | 04 /
Teshima, Koji Mitsubishi Pharma Corp., 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | 05 /
Hoshino, Yukio Mitsubishi Pharma Corp., 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | 06 /
FUJITA Tetsuro 40-23,Daigokuden,Kaide-cho,Muko-shi Kyoto 617-0004 / JP | [2003/26] |
Former [2003/25] | 01 /
Adachi, Kunitomo Mitsubishi Pharma Corp., 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | ||
02 /
Aoki, Yoshiyuki Mitsubishi Pharma Corp., 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | |||
03 /
Hanano, Tokushi Mitsubishi Pharma Corp., 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | |||
04 /
Teshima, Koji Mitsubishi Pharma Corp., 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | |||
05 /
Hoshino, Yukio Mitsubishi Pharma Corp., 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2003/25] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Deichmannhaus am Dom, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 03003623.0 | 03.04.1998 | [2003/25] | Priority number, date | JP19970086255 | 04.04.1997 Original published format: JP 8625597 | [2003/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1319651 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1319651 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1319651 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07C223/02, C07C225/16, C07C215/34, A61K31/135, A61P37/06 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
C07C225/16 (EP,US);
C07C255/16 (KR);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2003/25] | C07C223/02, A61K31/135, A61P37/06, C07C225/16, C07C215/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/25] | Extension states | AL | 15.02.2003 | LT | 15.02.2003 | LV | 15.02.2003 | MK | 15.02.2003 | RO | 15.02.2003 | SI | 15.02.2003 | Title | German: | 2-Aminopropan-1,3-diol-Verbindungen, ihre medizinische Anwendung und Zwischenprodukte zu ihrer Synthese | [2003/25] | English: | 2-Aminopropane-1,3-diol compound, pharmaceutical use thereof and synthetic intermediates therefor | [2003/25] | French: | Dérivés de 2-aminopropane-1,3-diol, leur utilisation pharmaceutique, et intermédiaires servant à leur synthèse | [2003/25] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/25] | 10.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98911211.5 / EP1002792 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]EP0627406 (YOSHITOMI PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [DY] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [DY]WO9606068 (YOSHITOMI PHARMACEUTICAL [JP], et al) [DY] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [L]EP0778263 (YOSHITOMI PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [L] 1-12* the whole document * |